Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Century National Insurace, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Gibson & Sharps Psc, against Ken Weems, represented by Law Offices Of Edward W Hess Jr, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2012 |
CategoryOther-Pi/Pd/Wd Tort-Over $25,000 (Riverside)&Nbsp; |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Case Cycle Time1346 days |
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CENTURY NATIONAL INSURACE
Date: 2013-08-29T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92544.
Date: 2012-12-11T00:00:00COURT REPORTER FEE (UNDER ONE HOUR) PAID BY CENTURY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY FOR HEARING 09/24/13.
Date: 2013-07-23T00:00:00CASE RE-ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 10 FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES.
Date: 2014-03-13T00:00:00REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED
Date: July 26, 2016CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY KEN WEEMS FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.
Date: 2013-05-30T00:00:00HEARING SET 9/24/13 AT 9:00 IN DEPARTMENT 02
Date: 2013-07-23T00:00:00RE-ASSIGN DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO 03
Date: November 24, 2014RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL
Date: 2014-04-14T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.
Date: 2012-12-11T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY CENTURY NATIONAL INSURACE FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.
Date: 2013-06-03T00:00:00NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE (CONTINUED) AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE BY KEN WEEMS FILED.
Date: 2014-04-23T00:00:00SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/11/2012 OF CENTURY NATIONAL INSURACE FILED
Date: 2012-12-11T00:00:00DECLARATION OF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED
Date: 2014-05-13T00:00:00CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 02 FOR LAW AND MOTION PURPOSES.
Date: 2012-12-11T00:00:00DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 03. (RIVERSIDE)
Date: 2012-12-11T00:00:00SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.
Date: June 29, 2016FAX FILING BY CENTURY NATIONAL INSURACE ($1.50 PER PAGE).
Date: 2014-08-13T00:00:00SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE: DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE.
Date: 2014-08-13T00:00:00SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL.
Date: June 29, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.