Vincent Miranda,
filed a(n)
General Criminal -
Criminal
case
against
District Attorney,
in the jurisdiction of Riverside County.
This case was filed in
Riverside County
Superior Courts
with Jeffrey Prevost presiding.
Case Details for
Vincent Miranda v. District Attorney
Case Events for
Vincent Miranda v. District Attorney
Date
Type
Description
April 24, 2012
Hearing
CLERK'S CALENDAR-REVIEW HEARING ON PETITION TO DISMISS CRIMINAL/INFRACTION CASE PURSUANT TO 1203.4/1203.4A/1203.4A(D) PC. REQUEST FROM DA/PROBATION DUE BY 04/23/12. Vacated
April 19, 2012
Hearing
EX PARTE HEARING RE 1203.4 DISMISSAL. Completed
April 19, 2012
Docket Event
EX PARTE HEARING SET ON 4/19/12 AT 8:30 IN DEPT 44
April 19, 2012
Docket Event
ORDER FOR 1203.4 DISMISSAL IS DENIED; HONORABLE JUDGE JEFFREY J. PREVOST.
Judge: JEFFREY J. PREVOST.
April 17, 2012
Docket Event
CCRPDC HEARING SET FOR 04/24/12 AT 08:30 IS VACATED -FOR THE REASON: RESPONSE FILED Not Applicable
April 17, 2012
Docket Event
REQUEST FOR DISPOSITION OR RULING RECEIVED FROM DISTRICT ATTORNEY [PC 1203.4/1203.4A]. Not Applicable
April 09, 2012
Docket Event
CLERK'S CALENDAR REVIEW HEARING ON PETITION TO DISMISS CRIMINAL CASE SET 4/24/12 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. RCLRK.
April 09, 2012
Docket Event
CRIMINAL CASE PURGED, THEREFORE PETITION FOR DISMISSAL IS FILED IN THE CIVIL MODULE - CRIMINAL CASE# RIM347662. Not Applicable
April 06, 2012
Docket Event
PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED - PETITION FOR DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO 1203.4/1203.4A PC. Not Applicable
April 06, 2012
Docket Event
PETITION FOR DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO PC 1203.4/1203.4A FILED. Not Applicable