Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Chase Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Hunt & Henriques, against Navneet Kaur, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 10, 2010 |
CategoryCollection Crc 3.740-Under $10,000 (Riverside)&Nbsp; |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions97 days |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED - COLLECTION
Date: December 10, 2010JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK FILED 03/17/11
Date: March 17, 2011CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.
Date: 2010-12-10T00:00:00HEARING RE OSC FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT SET 12/05/11 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 10.
Date: 2010-12-10T00:00:00DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 10 FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES (COLLECTION).
Date: 2010-12-10T00:00:00LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTION UNDER $10,000 CRC 3.740 FILED.
Date: 2010-12-10T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION) FILED 12/10/2010 OF CHASE BANK USA NA AND FILED.
Date: 2010-12-10T00:00:00ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED
Date: May 10, 2011REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (OTHER) THE UNJUST ENRICHMENT CLAIM AS TO NAVNEET KAUR FILED.
Date: March 17, 2011DECLARATION RE COSTS PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1033 FILED BY CHASE BANK USA NA
Date: March 17, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.