Citibank,
filed a(n)
Collections -
Creditor
case
represented by
The Moore Law Group,
against
Spike Deleon,
represented by
Unrepresented,
in the jurisdiction of Riverside County.
This case was filed in
Riverside County
Superior Courts
.
Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.740. Vacated
February 29, 2012
DATE TO SET OSC RE DESTRUCTION OF FILE (DISMISSAL)
December 02, 2011
HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED AGAINST PLAINTIFF FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. Vacated
March 01, 2011
Docket Event
Request for Dismissal WITHOUT prejudice Entire Action filed
March 01, 2011
DATE TO SET OSC FOR DESTRUCTION (DISMISSAL) IS SET 2/29/12 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. RIDST
March 01, 2011
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED Not Applicable
February 24, 2011
Docket Event
Request for Entry of Default ONLY on the Complaint (Collection) of CITIBANK (SOUTH DAKOTA) N.A. as to SPIKE DELEON filed.
February 24, 2011
REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTION) FILED 12/06/2010 OF CITIBANK (SOUTH DAKOTA) N.A. AS TO SPIKE DELEON FILED. Not Applicable
December 22, 2010
Docket Event
Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint (Collection) of CITIBANK (SOUTH DAKOTA) N.A. as to SPIKE DELEON; mailing date of 12/20/10 filed.
December 22, 2010
PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION) FILED 12/06/2010 OF CITIBANK (SOUTH DAKOTA) N.A. AS TO SPIKE DELEON; MAILING DATE OF 12/20/10 FILED. Not Applicable