Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Vion Holdings Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Law Offices Of Curtis O Barnes, against Alicia Cuevas, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Jacqueline C. Jackson presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 10, 2010 |
CategoryCollection Crc 3.740-Under $10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions250 days |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Memorandum of Credits of $0.00.
Date: December 19, 2012Declaration re Non Service of SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT on ALICIA CUEVAS filed
Date: 2010-12-28T00:00:00Declaration re Costs Pursuant to C.C.P. 1033 filed by VION HOLDINGS LLC
Date: 2011-08-09T00:00:00Judgment by Default by Clerk filed 08/17/11
Date: 2011-08-17T00:00:00Declaration of OF VIJAY S DESAI RE INTEREST filed
Date: 2011-08-09T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the Complaint (Collection) of VION HOLDINGS LLC filed.
Date: 2011-08-09T00:00:00Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collection under $10,000 CRC 3.740 filed.
Date: 2010-12-10T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel filed.
Date: 2010-12-10T00:00:00Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection) of VION HOLDINGS LLC and filed.
Date: 2010-12-10T00:00:00HEARING RE OSC FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT SET 12/05/11 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 6X - RESCHEDULED TO:.
Date: 2010-12-29T00:00:00DECLARATION RE COSTS PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1033 FILED BY VION HOLDINGS LLC
Date: 2011-08-09T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.
Date: 2010-12-10T00:00:00DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 06 FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES (COLLECTION).
Date: 2010-12-10T00:00:00HEARING RE OSC FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT SET 12/05/11 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 07.
Date: 2011-02-08T00:00:00HEARING RE OSC FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT SET 12/05/11 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 01.
Date: 2010-12-29T00:00:00DECLARATION RE NON SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON ALICIA CUEVAS FILED
Date: 2010-12-28T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION) FILED 12/10/2010 OF VION HOLDINGS LLC AND FILED.
Date: 2010-12-10T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.
Date: December 19, 2012ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED
Date: 2011-10-04T00:00:00JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK FILED 08/17/11
Date: 2011-08-17T00:00:00RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION
Date: March 26, 2015HEARING RE OSC FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT SET 12/05/11 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 06.
Date: 2010-12-10T00:00:00--AND ACCRUED INTEREST OF $497.49 AND COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT IN THE SUM OF $0.00 FILED.
Date: December 19, 2012COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED - COLLECTION
Date: 2010-12-10T00:00:00DECLARATION OF OF VIJAY S DESAI RE INTEREST FILED
Date: 2011-08-09T00:00:00LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTION UNDER $10,000 CRC 3.740 FILED.
Date: 2010-12-10T00:00:00HEARING RE OSC FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT SET 12/05/11 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 01 - RESCHEDULED TO:.
Date: 2011-02-08T00:00:00WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; LOS ANGELES COUNTY
Date: December 24, 2012For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.