Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Kenita Taylor, filed a(n) Unlimited Civil case against Wanda D. Robinson, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Kelli M. Evans presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKelli M. Evans Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2021 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil |
Last RefreshedApril 06, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Harassment Restraining Order Hearing scheduled for 04/05/2022 at 09:00 AM in Wiley W. Manuel Courthouse at Department 105 updated: Result Date to 04/05/2022 Result Type to Held Event |
|
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Civil Harassment Restraining Order Hearing) Minute Order |
|
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
On the Petition filed by Taylor vs robinson on 09/30/2021, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action Dismissal |
|
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Harassment Restraining Order Hearing scheduled for 01/13/2022 at 09:00 AM in Wiley W. Manuel Courthouse at Department 105 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 04/05/2022 09:00 AM Event |
|
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Amended Minute Order (Civil Harassment Restraining Order Hearing) Minute Order |
|
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Civil Harassment Restraining Order Hearing) Minute Order |
|
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Harassment Restraining Order Hearing scheduled for 04/05/2022 at 09:00 AM in Wiley W. Manuel Courthouse at Department 105 Event |
|
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
CH-116 Order on Request to Continue Hearing Issued and Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case reassigned to Wiley W. Manuel Courthouse in Department 105 - Hon. Kelli Evanseffective 10/18/2021Reason: Transfer for Reassignment Assignment |
|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Harassment 01/13/2022 09:00 AM D- 105 ScheduleHearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.