Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Kyb Homes Llc, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Marie Gisele Quashnock, Marie G. Quashnock, against Delores T. Woods, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2021 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a legal document filed by KYB Homes LLC, a California limited liability company, against Delores T. Woods and other unknown defendants. The complaint is seeking the partition of a single-family residence located at 1468 77th Avenue,...
Proof of Service on Complaint As to Delores T. Woods Filed
Date: October 07, 2021Initial Case Management Conference 02/14/2022 03:00 PM D- 25
Date: October 01, 2021Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: September 30, 2021Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: October 01, 2021Case Management Statement Filed by: KYB Homes LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: March 17, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for KYB Homes LLC
Date: September 30, 2021Complaint Other Real Property Filed
Date: September 30, 2021Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Filed by: KYB Homes LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: December 16, 2021Proof of Service by Mail Filed by: KYB Homes LLC (Plaintiff) As to: Delores T. Woods (Defendant)
Date: December 16, 2021Case Management Statement Filed by: KYB Homes LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: January 24, 2022Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation Filed by: Clerk
Date: February 10, 2022Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other ENTRY OF COURT INTERLOCUTORY JUDGME...)
Date: March 23, 2022General Order (Case Management Order) Entered by: Clerk
Date: April 07, 2022Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other ENTRY OF COURT INTERLOCUTORY JUDGME...)
Date: April 13, 2022Default entered as to Delores T. Woods On the Complaint filed by Kyb homes llc on 09/30/2021
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Updated -- Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings: Result: Granted in Part Result Date: 04/13/2022
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Default entered as to Delores T. Woods On the Complaint filed by Kyb homes llc on 09/30/2021
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00ERROR with ROA message definition 92 on [ln 32, col 39] with Document:34670831
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Hearing Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order Filed by: KYB Homes LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by: KYB Homes LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-15T00:00:00Application for Order to Post Filed by: KYB Homes LLC (Plaintiff) As to: Delores T. Woods (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: 2022-08-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by: KYB Homes LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-05T00:00:00Updated -- Application for Order to Post: Result: Granted Result Date: 05/23/2022
Date: 2022-05-23T00:00:00Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-12T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order Filed by: KYB Homes LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by: KYB Homes LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-23T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Order Authorizing Issuance of Writ of P...)
Date: January 18, 2023Case Management Statement Filed by: KYB Homes LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: December 27, 2022Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.