Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
John Ryan Marks, filed a(n) Unlimited Civil case against Marlisa Fisher, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Kelli M. Evans presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKelli M. Evans Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2021 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil |
Last RefreshedJanuary 14, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Harassment Restraining Order Hearing scheduled for 01/13/2022 at 09:00 AM in Wiley W. Manuel Courthouse at Department 105 updated: Result Date to 01/13/2022 Result Type to Held Event |
|
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Civil Harassment Restraining Order Hearing) Minute Order |
|
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
On the Petition filed by Marks vs fisher on 09/30/2021, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action Dismissal |
|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL FW-003 Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed by: Clerk As to: John Ryan Marks (Petitioner) Document |
|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case reassigned to Wiley W. Manuel Courthouse in Department 105 - Hon. Kelli Evanseffective 10/18/2021Reason: Transfer for Reassignment Assignment |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notes: Printed for pick up from RCD Filing |
|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Harassment 01/13/2022 09:00 AM D- 105 ScheduleHearing |
|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Court Hearing (Civil Harassment Prevention) CH-109 Request for CH-109 |
|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order CH-110 Request for CH-110 |
|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Service by Mail DSM002 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.