Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Dell, Robert, Robert Dell, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Kelsey Mccullough Szamet, Kelsey M. Szamet, Nathan K. Low, Szamet, Kelsey M., against Us Ecology Illinois, Inc, Us Ecology, Inc, Us Ecology Vernon, Inc, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2021 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Filed by: Robert Dell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-03T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Statement Filed by: Robert Dell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00Order to File Second Amended Class and Representative Action Complaint Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-11-21T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other Motion for Preliminary Approval of ...)
Date: 2023-03-01T00:00:00Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: 2022-11-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by: US Ecology Illinois, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-01T00:00:00Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: 2022-08-09T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by: US Ecology Illinois, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by: Robert Dell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-29T00:00:00Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-09T00:00:00Answer Filed by: NRC Environmental Services, Inc. Erroneously Sued As US Ecology, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Order re: Hearing on Motion - Other Complaint - Other Employment Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: November 03, 2021Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Statement Filed by: Robert Dell (Plaintiff)
Date: November 16, 2021Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other Complaint - Other Employment)
Date: November 03, 2021Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: September 30, 2021Case Management Conference 12/01/2021 09:00 AM D- 21
Date: October 05, 2021Notice of Court's Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: October 07, 2021Complaint - Other Employment Filed
Date: September 30, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Robert Dell
Date: September 30, 2021Case Management Conference 12/01/2021 09:00 AM D- 21
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Robert Dell
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Complaint - Other Employment Filed
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2023 | Case Management Conference | ||
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/19/2023 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 21 Event |
|
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order re: Hearing on Motion - Other Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement Signed and Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Motion - Other Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement scheduled for 05/19/2023 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 21 updated: Result Date to 05/19/2023 Result Type to Held - Motion Granted Event |
|
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/03/2023 at 01:30 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 21 Event |
|
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Case Management Conference) Minute Order |
|
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other Motion for Preliminary Approval of ...) Minute Order |
|
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling Published for 05/19/2023 9:00 AM Case Management Conference} Tentative Ruling |
|
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling Published for 05/19/2023 9:00 AM Hearing on Motion - Other Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement} Tentative Ruling |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.