Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Norcal Home Systems, Inc., A California Corporation, filed a(n) General Property - Property case against Rhonda Robinson, Rhonda L. Robinson Trustee Of The, Rhonda L. Robinson Revocable Trust, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2021 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil (Other Real Property (Not Emin...) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2023 | Case Management Conference | ||
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order re: Initial Case Management Conference re Arbitration Status Signed and Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Initial Case Management Conference re Arbitration Status) Minute Order |
|
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Initial Case Management Conference re Arbitration Status scheduled for 08/31/2022 at 02:30 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 16 updated: Result Date to 08/31/2022 Result Type to Held Event |
|
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/03/2023 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 16 Event |
|
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel scheduled for 11/02/2022 at 02:30 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 16 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 08/31/2022 Event |
|
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil Signed and Filed by: Rhonda Robinson (Defendant); Rhonda L. Robinson Trustee of the (Defendant); Rhonda L. Robinson Revocable Trust (Defendant) As to: Norcal Home Systems, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff) Document |
|
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Updated -- Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil: Result: Granted Result Date: 08/30/2022 Document |
|
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Rhonda Robinson (Defendant); Rhonda L. Robinson Trustee of the (Defendant); Rhonda L. Robinson Revocable Trust (Defendant) Document |
|
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil Filed by: Rhonda Robinson (Defendant); Rhonda L. Robinson Trustee of the (Defendant); Rhonda L. Robinson Revocable Trust (Defendant) Document |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.