Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Ahmed Alyousifi, Alyousifi, Ahmed, Alyousifi, Fatima, Fatima Alyousifi, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Abdo, Aliah A., Aliah A. Abdo, Aliah Azzam Abdo, against Alfaro Construction Services Partnership, Alfaro, Johnny, Alfaro, Luis, Alfaro'S Construction Services, American Contractors Indemnity Company, (total of 9) See All represented by Lubna K. Jahangiri, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Julia Spain presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 09, 2021 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil (Other Breach Of Contract/Warr...) |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by: Ahmed Alyousifi (Plaintiff); Fatima Alyousifi (Plaintiff)
Date: November 01, 2021Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed
Date: July 09, 2021Proof of Service on Complaint As to Pro Connect Electrical, Inc. Filed
Date: September 03, 2021Proof of Service on Complaint As to Johnny Alfaro Filed
Date: September 15, 2021Proof of Service on Complaint As to Alfaro Construction Services Partnership Filed
Date: September 15, 2021Proof of Service on Complaint As to Alfaro's Construction Services Filed
Date: September 15, 2021Proof of Service on Complaint As to Luis Alfaro Filed
Date: September 15, 2021Case Management Statement Filed by: Ahmed Alyousifi (Plaintiff); Fatima Alyousifi (Plaintiff)
Date: February 02, 2022Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: August 05, 2021Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: July 28, 2021Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 11/24/2021 09:00 AM D- 24
Date: August 05, 2021Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: July 09, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Ahmed Alyousifi
Date: July 09, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum Filed
Date: July 09, 2021Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: July 14, 2021Request Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Julia Spain Granted
Date: July 28, 2021Initial Case Management Conference 11/24/2021 09:30 AM D- 520
Date: July 14, 2021Case Management Statement Filed by: Pro Connect Electrical, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: February 09, 2022General Order (Case Management Order) Entered by: Clerk
Date: November 04, 2021Case Management Statement Filed by: Ahmed Alyousifi (Plaintiff); Fatima Alyousifi (Plaintiff)
Date: November 01, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Ahmed Alyousifi
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Request Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Julia Spain Granted
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum Filed
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Request Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Julia Spain Filed for Ahmed Alyousifi, Fatima Alyousifi
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 11/24/2021 09:30 AM D- 520
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.