Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Gamez, Lyndonna, Lyndonna Gamez, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Alwazian, Edwin, Edwin Alwazian, against Does 1 Through 100, Mercy Housing, Inc, Mercy Housing Management Group, Inc, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts Superior with Jeffrey S. Brand presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJeffrey S. Brand Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 19, 2021 |
CategoryOther Employment |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Declaration in Opposition
Date: August 10, 2021Declaration in Opposition
Date: August 10, 2021Proof of Service
Date: August 12, 2021Motion to Stay Proceedings - Motion Rescheduled
Date: August 17, 2021Proof of Service on Motion
Date: July 21, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed
Date: August 12, 2021Proposed Order
Date: July 21, 2021Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: November 17, 2021Proof of Service on Complaint As to Mercy Housing, INC Filed
Date: July 22, 2021Proof of Service on Motion
Date: July 22, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: July 21, 2021Proof of Service on Complaint As to Mercy Housing Management Group, INC Filed
Date: July 22, 2021Proof of Service (Amended) on Filed
Date: September 01, 2021Proof of Service
Date: August 10, 2021Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: August 17, 2021Proof of Service
Date: August 31, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply Filed
Date: August 31, 2021Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: August 17, 2021Motion to Stay Proceedings Granted
Date: September 14, 2021Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: September 14, 2021Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: September 14, 2021Declaration in Support Marc L Jacuzzi
Date: July 21, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Lyndonna Gamez
Date: May 19, 2021Complaint - Other Employment Filed
Date: May 19, 2021Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: May 19, 2021Initial Case Management Conference 12/28/2021 02:30 PM D- 22
Date: June 02, 2021Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: June 02, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: July 21, 2021Motion to Stay Proceedings Filed for Defendant
Date: July 21, 2021Minute Order (Initial Case Management Conference)
Date: January 24, 2022Proof of Service on Complaint As to Mercy Housing Management Group, INC Filed
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply Filed
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Mercy Housing, INC Filed
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Proof of Service on Motion
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 12/28/2021 02:30 PM D- 22
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Motion to Stay Proceedings Filed for Defendant
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Complaint - Other Employment Filed
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Mercy Housing Management Group, INC, Mercy Housing, INC
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Non-Opposition to Motion Filed by Mercy Housing Management Group, INC, Mercy Housing, INC
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Motion to Stay Proceedings - Motion Rescheduled
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Lyndonna Gamez
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (Amended) on Filed
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling Published for 05/08/2023 3:00 PM Compliance Hearing} Tentative Ruling |
|
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Joint Status Conference Statement Filed by: Lyndonna Gamez (Plaintiff) Document |
|
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Reset - Court Unavailable, Compliance Hearing scheduled for 05/08/2023 at 02:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 22 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 05/08/2023 03:00 PM Event |
|
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Compliance Hearing scheduled for 05/08/2023 at 02:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 22 Event |
|
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/16/2022 at 02:30 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 22 Event |
|
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Case Management Conference) Minute Order |
|
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
November 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Joint Status Conference Statement Filed by: Lyndonna Gamez (Plaintiff); Mercy Housing Management Group, INC (Defendant); Mercy Housing, INC (Defendant) Document |
|
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/16/2022 at 02:30 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 22 Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.