Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Yathirajadasan, Amit, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Arbm, Inc, Jaguar Land Rover North America, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Stephen M. Pulido presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 20, 2021 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to ARBM, Inc Filed
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC Filed
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Amit Yathirajadasan
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for ARBM, Inc
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 10/04/2021 03:00 PM D- 517
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: October 04, 2021Case Management Statement of Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC Filed
Date: September 16, 2021Case Management Statement of Amit Yathirajadasan Filed
Date: September 17, 2021Answer to Complaint Filed for Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC
Date: July 28, 2021Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: October 04, 2021Tentative Case Management Order
Date: September 29, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.