Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Javier Ramirez, Ramirez, Javier, filed a(n) Unlimited Civil case against Tri-City Autowash, Inc, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Somnath Raj Chatterjee presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 18, 2021 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
|
Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: March 22, 2022Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: March 22, 2022Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: September 30, 2021Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation Filed by: Clerk
Date: February 23, 2022Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: September 30, 2021Notice of Notice Posting Jury Fees Filed
Date: August 25, 2021Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: May 24, 2021Answer to Complaint Filed for Tri-City Autowash, Inc
Date: June 28, 2021Case Management Statement of Javier Ramirez Filed
Date: August 25, 2021Case Management Statement of Tri-City Autowash, Inc Filed
Date: September 15, 2021Initial Case Management Conference 09/30/2021 03:00 PM D- 517
Date: May 24, 2021Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: May 18, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Javier Ramirez
Date: May 18, 2021Complaint - Wrongful Termination Filed
Date: May 18, 2021Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Complaint - Wrongful Termination Filed
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Tentative Case Management Order
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Javier Ramirez Filed
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Tri-City Autowash, Inc
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Javier Ramirez
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 09/30/2021 03:00 PM D- 517
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Tri-City Autowash, Inc Filed
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Notice of Notice Posting Jury Fees Filed
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.