Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Environmental Health Advocates, Inc., filed a(n) Other Complaint case against Fresh Gourmet Company Llc, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Stephen M. Pulido presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2022 |
CategoryOther Complaint |
Last RefreshedJuly 27, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
|
Case Management Statement of Fresh Gourmet Company LLC Filed
Date: July 09, 2021Complaint - Other Filed
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Environmental Health Advocates, Inc.
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury fees Filed
Date: July 12, 2021Case Management Statement of Environmental Health Advocates, Inc. Filed
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: July 26, 2021Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Fresh Gourmet Company LLC Filed
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: July 26, 2021Notice of Related Case(s) Filed
Date: July 12, 2021Initial Case Management Conference 07/26/2021 03:00 PM D- 517
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Environmental Health Advocates, Inc. Filed
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Tentative Case Management Order
Date: July 21, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.