Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Jendayi, Zakiya, Zakiya Jendayi, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case against Goins & Associates, Goins, Vernon C., Vernon C. Goins, represented by Vernon Goins, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts Superior with Eumi K. Lee presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 16, 2021 |
CategoryProfessional Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Summons on Amended Complaint (1st) Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: October 18, 2021Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: August 18, 2021Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: August 18, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Zakiya Jendayi
Date: February 16, 2021Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: February 16, 2021Complaint - Professional Negligence Filed
Date: February 16, 2021Case Management Statement Filed by: Zakiya Jendayi (Plaintiff)
Date: October 18, 2021Case Management Statement Filed by: Zakiya Jendayi (Plaintiff)
Date: January 12, 2022Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) Filed by: Vernon C. Goins (Defendant)
Date: November 19, 2021Initial Case Management Conference 08/23/2021 03:00 PM D- 20
Date: February 22, 2021Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: February 22, 2021Case Management Statement of Zakiya Jendayi Filed
Date: August 18, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by: Zakiya Jendayi (Plaintiff)
Date: October 12, 2021General Order (Non-Appearance Case Review) Entered by: Clerk
Date: November 04, 2021Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation Filed by: Clerk
Date: October 26, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by: Vernon C. Goins (Defendant)
Date: November 19, 2021Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Vernon C. Goins (Defendant)
Date: November 19, 2021Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10))
Date: January 19, 2022Case Management Statement Filed by: Vernon C. Goins (Defendant)
Date: January 25, 2022General Order (Non-Appearance Case Review) Entered by: Clerk
Date: February 01, 2022Amended Complaint (4th) Filed by: Zakiya Jendayi (Plaintiff) As to: Vernon C. Goins (Defendant)
Date: 2023-03-17T00:00:00Order re: Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-03T00:00:00Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by: Vernon C. Goins (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-15T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10))
Date: 2023-02-03T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10))
Date: 2023-02-08T00:00:00Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: 2022-12-07T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by: Vernon C. Goins (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-14T00:00:00Demurrer Filed by: Vernon C. Goins (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-14T00:00:00Amended Complaint (3rd) Filed by: Zakiya Jendayi (Plaintiff) As to: Vernon C. Goins (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-07T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Vernon C. Goins (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-14T00:00:00Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: 2022-08-31T00:00:00Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-31T00:00:00Order re: Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by: Zakiya Jendayi (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-19T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10))
Date: 2022-08-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by: Vernon C. Goins (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by: Vernon C. Goins (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-23T00:00:00Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: 2022-05-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by: Zakiya Jendayi (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) Filed by: Vernon C. Goins (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Order re: Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Declaration of Demurring Party Regarding Meet and Confer Filed by: Vernon C. Goins (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10))
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Amended Complaint (2nd) Filed by: Zakiya Jendayi (Plaintiff) As to: Vernon C. Goins (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Zakiya Jendayi Filed
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Complaint - Professional Negligence Filed
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Zakiya Jendayi
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 08/23/2021 03:00 PM D- 20
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 26, 2024 | Jury Trial | ||
August 12, 2024 | Pre-Trial Conference | ||
July 29, 2024 | Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) | ||
May 29, 2024 | Case Management Conference - ADR Compliance/MSC Readiness | ||
October 06, 2023 | Hearing on Motion to Strike filed by Vernon C. Goins (Defendant) | ||
October 06, 2023 | Hearing on Demurrer (Name Extension) filed by Vernon C. Goins (Defendant) | ||
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 08/12/2024 at 09:00 AM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 512 Event |
|
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Case Management Conference) Minute Order |
|
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/05/2023 at 09:30 AM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 512 updated: Result Date to 06/05/2023 Result Type to Held Event |
|
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference - ADR Compliance/MSC Readiness scheduled for 05/29/2024 at 03:00 PM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 512 Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.