Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Bca Structural Engineering, Inc., Dahlin Group, Inc., City Of Dublin, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by David Ginn, Doug Mcmanamon, Ginn, David W., against Bca Structural Engineering, Inc., Dahlin Group, Inc., represented by Enrique Marinez, Marinez, Enrique, Peters, William J., William J. Peters, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Stephen D. Kaus presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 01, 2021 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: October 26, 2021Demand for Jury Trial Filed by: BCA Structural Engineering, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: March 08, 2022Case Management Statement Filed by: City of Dublin (Plaintiff)
Date: March 01, 2022Answer Filed by: City of Dublin (Plaintiff)
Date: October 21, 2021Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: August 24, 2021Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: August 24, 2021Joint Case Management Statement Filed
Date: August 17, 2021Cross-Complaint Filed for BCA Structural Engineering, Inc.
Date: July 30, 2021Answer to Complaint Filed for BCA Structural Engineering, Inc.
Date: July 30, 2021Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed
Date: June 24, 2021Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: June 22, 2021Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: June 22, 2021Amended Answer to Complaint Filed for BCA Structural Engineering, Inc.
Date: June 11, 2021Case Management Statement of City of Dublin Filed
Date: June 08, 2021Case Management Statement of Dahlin Group, Inc. Filed
Date: June 07, 2021Case Management Statement of BCA Structural Engineering, Inc. Filed
Date: June 07, 2021Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: June 02, 2021Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for BCA Structural Engineering, Inc.
Date: May 13, 2021Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Dahlin Group, Inc.
Date: May 07, 2021Summons on Cross Complaint Issued
Date: May 07, 2021Cross-Complaint Filed for Dahlin Group, Inc.
Date: May 07, 2021Substitution of Attorney Filed for City of Dublin
Date: March 18, 2021Certificate of Merit Filed by City of Dublin
Date: February 10, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: February 10, 2021Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: February 10, 2021Initial Case Management Conference 06/22/2021 03:00 PM D- 19
Date: February 10, 2021Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: February 01, 2021First Amended Complaint Filed
Date: February 10, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for City of Dublin
Date: February 01, 2021Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed
Date: February 01, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 06/22/2021 03:00 PM D- 19
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed for City of Dublin
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement of BCA Structural Engineering, Inc. Filed
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Amended Answer to Complaint Filed for BCA Structural Engineering, Inc.
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement of City of Dublin Filed
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Certificate of Merit Filed by City of Dublin
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Dahlin Group, Inc.
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Summons on Cross Complaint Issued
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for City of Dublin
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed for Dahlin Group, Inc.
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Dahlin Group, Inc. Filed
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for BCA Structural Engineering, Inc.
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed for BCA Structural Engineering, Inc.
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Joint Case Management Statement Filed
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for BCA Structural Engineering, Inc.
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Tentative Case Management Order
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Tentative Case Management Order
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2023 | Jury Trial | ||
July 07, 2023 | Pre-Trial Conference | ||
June 23, 2023 | Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) | ||
March 10, 2023 | Jury Trial | ||
March 03, 2023 | Pre-Trial Conference | ||
February 14, 2023 | Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) | ||
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 03/03/2023 at 02:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 19 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 07/07/2023 02:00 PM Event |
|
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) scheduled for 02/14/2023 at 09:00 AM in George E. McDonald Hall of Justice at Department 302 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 06/23/2023 09:00 AM at Department 301 Event |
|
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial scheduled for 03/10/2023 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 19 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 07/14/2023 09:00 AM Event |
|
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/18/2022 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 19 updated: Result Date to 10/18/2022 Result Type to Held Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.