Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Environmental Health Advocates, Inc., filed a(n) Other Complaint case represented by Glick, Noam, Noam Glick, against Mondelez Global, Llc, Safeway, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with James R. Reilly presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames R. Reilly Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 02, 2021 |
CategoryOther Complaint |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
|
Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other Motion)
Date: December 08, 2021Order re: Hearing on Motion - Other Motion Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: December 08, 2021Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: November 18, 2021Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: November 18, 2021Case Management Statement Filed by: Environmental Health Advocates, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: November 04, 2021Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 11/18/2021 03:00 PM D- 25
Date: September 29, 2021Release of Funds Issued and Filed
Date: August 02, 2021Proof of Service By Electronic Mail & By Mail Via Email Service Filed
Date: July 02, 2021Case Management Statement of Environmental Health Advocates, Inc. Filed
Date: July 02, 2021Answer to Complaint Filed for Mondelez Global, LLC
Date: June 24, 2021Motion to Approve Proposition 65 Settlement Denied
Date: June 24, 2021Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: June 24, 2021Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: April 05, 2021Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Hearing Granted
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Motion to Approve Proposition 65 Settlement Taken Under Submission
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to Continue the Hearing for Plaintiff's Motion to Approve Prop 65 Settlement a
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Proposed Judgment Received
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Mondelez Global, LLC Filed
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Dismissal As to Defendant: Safeway, Inc. Entered
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Mondelez Global, LLC
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 06/17/2021 09:00 AM D- 25
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Complaint - Other Filed
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Motion to Approve Proposition 65 Settlement Filed by Environmental Health Advocates, Inc.
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Motion to Approve Proposition 65 Settlement Filed
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Declaration of Dr. John Meeker ISO Plaintiff's Motion to Approve Proposition 65 Settlement and Conse
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Proof of Service by Electronic re Notice of Motion to Approve Prop. 65 Settlement; MPA;Declarations
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Granted
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Environmental Health Advocates, Inc.
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Notice of Errata Re: Motion to Approve Proposition 65 Settlement Filed
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Filed for Mondelez Global, LLC,
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Hearing Filed for Environmental Health Advocates, Inc.
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Safeway, Inc. Filed
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Safeway, Inc. Filed
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Motion to Approve Proposition 65 Settlement Denied
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.