Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Robert Ross, Ross, Robert, filed a(n) Unlimited Civil case represented by Christine D. Spagnoli, Lanzetta, Tobin M., Spagnoli, Christine D., Tobin M. Lanzetta, against Bayerische Motoren Werke Ag, Bmw Of North America, Llc, Demont Jackson, Henderson, Mack Ambrose, Jackson, Demont, (total of 7) See All represented by Brandon W. Lansche, Meyer, Steven E, Steven E Meyer, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts Superior with Somnath Raj Chatterjee presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSomnath Raj Chatterjee Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: March 24, 2022Default entered as to Demont Jackson On the Complaint filed by Ross on 12/23/2020
Date: April 27, 2023Proof of Service on Complaint As to Bayerische Motoren Werke AG Filed
Date: September 17, 2021Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: October 07, 2021Case Management Statement Filed by: Robert Ross (Plaintiff)
Date: March 09, 2022Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: October 07, 2021Case Management Statement of BMW of North America, LLC Filed
Date: September 23, 2021Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation Filed by: Clerk
Date: February 23, 2022Case Management Statement of Robert Ross Filed
Date: September 22, 2021Answer to Complaint Filed for Weatherford Motors, Inc.
Date: April 05, 2021Application Re: Other Ex Parte Granted
Date: June 30, 2021Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: May 10, 2021Application Re: Extension of Time Filed for Robert Ross
Date: June 28, 2021Application Re: Extension of Time Granted
Date: June 30, 2021Order To Appoint Special Process Service Filed
Date: June 30, 2021Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:
Date: June 28, 2021Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: June 17, 2021Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: May 10, 2021Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: June 30, 2021Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: May 10, 2021Proposed Order Application|
Date: June 28, 2021Case Management Statement of Robert Ross Filed
Date: April 23, 2021Answer to Complaint Filed for BMW of North America, LLC
Date: February 11, 2021Application Re: Extension of Time Granted
Date: February 23, 2021Application Re: Extension of Time Filed for Robert Ross
Date: February 22, 2021Proof of Service on Complaint As to Mack Ambrose Henderson Filed
Date: February 03, 2021Proof of Service on Complaint As to Demont Jackson Filed
Date: February 03, 2021Proof of Service on Complaint As to Weatherford Motors, Inc. Filed
Date: February 03, 2021Proof of Service on Complaint As to BMW of North America, LLC Filed
Date: January 28, 2021Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: December 23, 2020Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: December 23, 2020Notice of of Deposit of Jury Fees Filed
Date: January 27, 2021Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: January 07, 2021Initial Case Management Conference 05/10/2021 03:00 PM D- 517
Date: January 07, 2021Complaint - Product Liability Filed
Date: December 23, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Robert Ross
Date: December 23, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Robert Ross
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Application Re: Extension of Time Filed for Robert Ross
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to BMW of North America, LLC Filed
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Mack Ambrose Henderson Filed
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Notice of of Deposit of Jury Fees Filed
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Application Re: Extension of Time Granted
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Weatherford Motors, Inc. Filed
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Weatherford Motors, Inc.
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for BMW of North America, LLC
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Robert Ross Filed
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Complaint - Product Liability Filed
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Demont Jackson Filed
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement of BMW of North America, LLC, Weatherford Motors, Inc. Filed
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 05/10/2021 03:00 PM D- 517
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement of BMW of North America, LLC Filed
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Application Re: Extension of Time Filed for Robert Ross
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Robert Ross Filed
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Order To Appoint Special Process Service Filed
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Application Re: Other Ex Parte Granted
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Application Re: Extension of Time Granted
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Bayerische Motoren Werke AG Filed
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Tentative Case Management Order
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Bayerische Motoren Werke AG, BMW of North America, LLC, Weatherford Mot
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Tentative Case Management Order
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.