Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Padilla, Yessenia, Yessenia Padilla, filed a(n) Product Liability case against Coopersurgical, Inc., Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R & D, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals, Usa, Inc., Teva Women'S Health, Inc., Teva Women'S Health, Llc, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Dennis W. Hayashi presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis W. Hayashi Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management16 days |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2020 |
CategoryProduct Liability |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
||
Motion Denied
Date: February 10, 2021Declaration of Service by Mail - Minutes
Date: May 05, 2021Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: May 05, 2021Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: May 05, 2021Notice of of Filing of Notice of Removal to U.S. District Court Filed
Date: February 16, 2021Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: February 11, 2021Initial Case Management Conference 05/05/2021 02:30 PM D- 518
Date: February 11, 2021Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: February 10, 2021Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: February 08, 2021Case Management Conference 03/10/2021 09:00 AM D- 21
Date: January 06, 2021Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: December 21, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Yessenia Padilla
Date: December 21, 2020Complaint - Product Liability Filed
Date: December 21, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Yessenia Padilla
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Notice of of Filing of Notice of Removal to U.S. District Court Filed
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Motion Denied
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 05/05/2021 02:30 PM D- 518
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Case Management Conference 03/10/2021 09:00 AM D- 21
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Complaint - Product Liability Filed
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Tentative Case Management Order
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 12, 2022 | Case Management Conference | ||
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/13/2021 at 02:30 PM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 518 updated: Result Date to 12/13/2021 Result Type to Held Event |
|
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/12/2022 at 02:30 PM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 518 Event |
|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Case Management Conference) Minute Order |
|
December 13, 2021 |
Judge: Case Management Conference |
||
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conf Continuance 12/13/2021 02:30 PM D- 518 ScheduleHearing |
|
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Service by Mail - Minutes DSM001 |
|
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Order Issued Ruling |
|
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.