Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Leticia Montes, Montes, Leticia, Ppm Technologies Holdings, Llc, filed a(n) Unlimited Civil case against Ppm Technologies Holdings, Llc, Ppm Technologies, Inc., Ppm Technologies, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts Superior with Somnath Raj Chatterjee presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSomnath Raj Chatterjee Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 11, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: March 10, 2022Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed
Date: September 15, 2021Case Management Statement Filed by: Leticia Montes (Plaintiff)
Date: February 25, 2022Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: September 23, 2021Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: September 23, 2021Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation Filed by: Clerk
Date: February 23, 2022Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: March 10, 2022Declaration DECLARATION OF ALEXIS McNICHOLS Filed by: PPM Technologies, LLC (Defendant)
Date: November 12, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: September 15, 2021Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed
Date: September 03, 2021Case Management Statement of PPM Technologies Holdings, LLC Filed
Date: September 09, 2021Case Management Statement of Leticia Montes Filed
Date: September 08, 2021Cross-Complaint Filed for PPM Technologies Holdings, LLC
Date: July 02, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: July 02, 2021Answer to Complaint Filed for PPM Technologies Holdings, LLC
Date: July 02, 2021Proof of Service on Complaint As to PPM Technologies Holdings, LLC Filed
Date: April 09, 2021Re-Notice of Jury fees Filed
Date: April 15, 2021Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: April 26, 2021Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: April 26, 2021Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: December 11, 2020Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: December 22, 2020Initial Case Management Conference 04/26/2021 03:00 PM D- 517
Date: December 22, 2020Complaint - Product Liability Filed
Date: December 11, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Leticia Montes
Date: December 11, 2020Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed for PPM Technologies Holdings, LLC
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Leticia Montes Filed
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Re-Notice of Jury fees Filed
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Complaint - Product Liability Filed
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 04/26/2021 03:00 PM D- 517
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Leticia Montes
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to PPM Technologies Holdings, LLC Filed
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for PPM Technologies Holdings, LLC
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement of PPM Technologies Holdings, LLC Filed
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Tentative Case Management Order
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Tentative Case Management Order
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling Published for 05/11/2023 2:30 PM Hearing on Motion for Leave to Intervene filed by Broadspire (Plaintiff in Intervention)} Tentative Ruling |
|
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Motion for Leave to Intervene filed by Broadspire (Plaintiff in Intervention) scheduled for 05/11/2023 at 02:30 PM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 517 Event |
|
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECLARATION OF PETER V. FITZPATRICK IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE COMPLAINT-IN-INTERVENTION Filed by: Broadspire (Plaintiff in Intervention) Document |
|
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Leave to Intervene Filed by: Broadspire (Plaintiff in Intervention) As to: PPM Technologies Holdings, LLC (Defendant); PPM Technologies, Inc. (Defendant); PPM Technologies, LLC (Defendant) Document |
|
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Updated -- Broadspire (Plaintiff in Intervention):Organization Name changed from Broadpire to Broadspire Party |
|
April 10, 2023 | Jury Trial | ||
April 07, 2023 | Pre-Trial Conference | ||
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Lien Filed by: PPM Technologies Holdings, LLC (Defendant); PPM Technologies, Inc. (Defendant); PPM Technologies, LLC (Defendant) Document |
|
March 14, 2023 | Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) | ||
November 17, 2022 | Case Management Conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.