Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Nicholas Lee Architectural Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Fishburn, Stephen, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Stephen Pulido presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2022 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedJuly 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 04/01/2021 03:00 PM D- 517
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Nicholas Lee Architectural Corporation
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: July 29, 2021Case Management Statement of Nicholas Lee Architectural Corporation Filed
Date: July 23, 2021Declaration of Diligence Filed
Date: July 09, 2021Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: July 29, 2021Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Tentative Case Management Order
Date: July 23, 2021Tentative Case Management Order
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.