Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Acevedo, Steven, Allison Kerns, Alyce Bull, Artemeise Jackson, Ashford, William, (total of 54) See All filed a(n) Unlimited Civil case against Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Usa Corporation, Glaxosmithkline Llc, Grocery Outlet, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management106 days |
Filing DateSeptember 08, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
|
Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: August 11, 2021Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: November 09, 2021Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: March 22, 2022Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: March 22, 2022Request for Dismissal Filed and Received by: Mary Price (Plaintiff)
Date: February 01, 2022Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: November 09, 2021Hearing Reset to Case Management Conference 06/01/2021 10:00 AM D- 21
Date: May 12, 2021Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: March 16, 2021First Amended Complaint Filed
Date: April 06, 2021Notice of re: Order Assigning Coordination Motion Judge; Certificate of Service Filed
Date: February 11, 2021Summons on Complaint Issued
Date: April 06, 2021Notice of Remand Filed
Date: November 06, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Robert Ingram
Date: September 08, 2020Case Management Conference 05/12/2021 10:00 AM D- 21
Date: December 23, 2020Complaint - Product Liability Filed
Date: September 08, 2020Order (1) Staying Cases and (2) Setting CMC Date Filed
Date: December 22, 2020Notice of of Submission of Petition for Coordination; Certificate of Service Filed
Date: November 12, 2020Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: September 08, 2020Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: September 15, 2020Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: December 18, 2020Notice of Hearing on Petition for Coordination Filed
Date: February 11, 2021Notice of Order Assigning Coordination Motion Judge; Certificate of Service Filed
Date: January 25, 2021Initial Case Management Conference 01/21/2021 02:30 PM D- 521
Date: September 15, 2020Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Complaint - Product Liability Filed
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Robert Ingram
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 01/21/2021 02:30 PM D- 521
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Notice of of Submission of Petition for Coordination; Certificate of Service Filed
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Removal Filed for Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., boehringer Ingelheim USA Cor
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Order (1) Staying Cases and (2) Setting CMC Date Filed
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Petition for Coordination Filed
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Case Management Conference 05/12/2021 10:00 AM D- 21
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Notice of re: Order Assigning Coordination Motion Judge; Certificate of Service Filed
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Notice of Order Assigning Coordination Motion Judge; Certificate of Service Filed
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Notice of Remand Filed
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Notice of regarding order assigning Coordination Trial Judge; Certificate of service Filed
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Order Assigning Coordination Trial to Judge Smith; Certificate of Service Filed
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Case Management Conference 06/01/2021 10:00 AM D- 21
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2023 | Case Management Conference | ||
December 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Case Management Conference) Minute Order |
|
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Case Management Conference) Minute Order |
|
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/18/2022 at 10:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 21 updated: Result Date to 10/18/2022 Result Type to Held Event |
|
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/17/2023 at 10:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 21 Event |
|
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Case Management Conference) Minute Order |
|
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Case Management Conference) Minute Order |
|
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/20/2022 at 10:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 21 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 10/19/2022 10:00 AM Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.