Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bulwinkle, Mark, Mark Bulwinkle, filed a(n) Unlimited Civil case represented by Dana Sack, Sack, Dana, against Barnes , Zachary, Lee & Associates Oakland Commercial Real Estate Services, Inc, Zachary Barnes, represented by Catalanotti, Peter C., Peter C. Catalanotti, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with James R. Reilly presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management155 days |
|
Filing DateJuly 01, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil |
Time To Trial155 days |
Last RefreshedDecember 20, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
||
Separate Statement Filed by: Mark Bulwinkle (Plaintiff)
Date: March 30, 2022Exhibit List Filed by: Mark Bulwinkle (Plaintiff)
Date: March 30, 2022Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: December 03, 2020Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: December 03, 2020Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: December 03, 2020Case Management Statement of Mark Bulwinkle Filed
Date: November 18, 2020Proof of Service on Complaint As to Zachary Barnes Filed
Date: July 22, 2020Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: July 06, 2020Initial Case Management Conference 12/03/2020 09:00 AM D- 25
Date: July 06, 2020Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: July 01, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Mark Bulwinkle
Date: July 01, 2020Complaint - Professional Negligence Filed
Date: July 01, 2020Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Lee & Associates Oakland Commercial Real Estate Services, INC F
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Mark Bulwinkle
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Complaint - Professional Negligence Filed
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 12/03/2020 09:00 AM D- 25
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Zachary Barnes Filed
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Mark Bulwinkle Filed
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Zachary Barnes, Lee & Associates Oakland Commercial Real Estate Servic
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Zachary Barnes, Lee & Associates Oakland Commercial Real Estate Service
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 20, 2022 | Jury Trial | ||
June 20, 2022 |
Judge: Complaint - Professional Negligence |
||
June 03, 2022 | Pre-Trial Conference | ||
June 03, 2022 |
Judge: Pretrial Conference |
||
May 25, 2022 | Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication | ||
May 23, 2022 | Pre-Trial Settlement Conference | ||
May 23, 2022 |
Judge: Settlement Conference |
||
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication scheduled for 05/20/2022 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 05/25/2022 03:00 PM Event |
|
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication scheduled for 05/11/2022 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 05/20/2022 09:00 AM Event |
|
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication scheduled for 05/20/2022 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 25 Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.