Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Dwight Norman, Norman, Dwight, filed a(n) Product Liability case against Glaxo Smith Kline, Llc, Glaxo Smith Kline, Plc, Kaiser Permanente International, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Evelio M. Grillo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEvelio M. Grillo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management18 days |
Filing DateMay 11, 2020 |
CategoryProduct Liability |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions21 days |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
||
Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 01/05/2021 03:00 PM D- 23
Date: October 07, 2020Notice of Removal Filed for Glaxo Smith Kline, LLC
Date: June 17, 2020Complaint - Product Liability Filed
Date: May 11, 2020Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: May 11, 2020Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: August 25, 2020Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: August 25, 2020Case Management Conference 08/25/2020 03:00 PM D- 23
Date: May 29, 2020Notice of Ruling Filed by: Dwight Norman (Plaintiff)
Date: December 30, 2021Notice of Related Case(s) Filed
Date: June 03, 2020Hearing Reset to Complex Determination Hearing 07/10/2020 09:31 AM D- 23
Date: June 10, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Dwight Norman
Date: May 11, 2020Notice of of Submission of the following: Filed
Date: May 05, 2021Notice of Related Case(s) Filed
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Dwight Norman
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Glaxo Smith Kline, PLC Filed
Date: 2020-06-01T00:00:00Case Management Conference 08/25/2020 03:00 PM D- 23
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00Notice of Removal Filed for Glaxo Smith Kline, LLC
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Complaint - Product Liability Filed
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Complex Determination Hearing 07/10/2020 09:31 AM D- 23
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 01/05/2021 03:00 PM D- 23
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Notice of of Submission of the following: Filed
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Case Management Conference) Minute Order |
|
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Case Management Conference) Minute Order |
|
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
The case is removed from the special status of: Stay - Removal to Federal Court Case |
|
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
The case is removed from the special status of: Legacy - Removed from Court control Case |
|
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
On the Complaint filed by Norman on 05/11/2020, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Dwight Norman as to the entire action Dismissal |
|
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed and Received by: Dwight Norman (Plaintiff) As to: Glaxo Smith Kline, LLC (Defendant); Glaxo Smith Kline, PLC (Defendant); Kaiser Permanente International (Defendant) Document |
|
July 26, 2022 | Compliance Hearing | ||
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Compliance Hearing; Case Management Conference) Minute Order |
|
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Compliance Hearing scheduled for 07/26/2022 at 10:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 21 Event |
|
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case reassigned to Rene C. Davidson Courthouse in Department 21 - Hon. Evelio Grillo Assignment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.