Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Chris Ives, Ives, Chris, filed a(n) Product Liability case against Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim Usa Corporation Inc, Glaxo Smith Kline, Llc, Glaxo Smith Kline, Plc, (total of 10) See All in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Evelio M. Grillo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEvelio M. Grillo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management17 days |
Filing DateMay 11, 2020 |
CategoryProduct Liability |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
||
Notice of Ruling Filed by: Chris Ives (Plaintiff)
Date: December 30, 2021Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: August 25, 2020Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: May 11, 2020Complaint - Product Liability Filed
Date: May 11, 2020Notice of Related Case(s) Filed
Date: June 03, 2020Case Management Conference 08/25/2020 03:00 PM D- 23
Date: May 28, 2020Notice of of Submission of the following: Filed
Date: May 05, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Chris Ives
Date: May 11, 2020Hearing Reset to Complex Determination Hearing 07/10/2020 09:30 AM D- 23
Date: June 10, 2020Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: August 25, 2020Notice of Removal Filed for Sanofi US Services Inc, Sanofi-Aventis U. S. LLC
Date: June 18, 2020Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 01/05/2021 03:00 PM D- 23
Date: October 07, 2020Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 01/05/2021 03:00 PM D- 23
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Complaint - Product Liability Filed
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Notice of Removal Filed for Sanofi US Services Inc, Sanofi-Aventis U. S. LLC
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Chris Ives
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Case Management Conference 08/25/2020 03:00 PM D- 23
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Notice of Related Case(s) Filed
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Glaxo Smith Kline, PLC, Boehringer Ingelh
Date: 2020-06-01T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Complex Determination Hearing 07/10/2020 09:30 AM D- 23
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Notice of of Submission of the following: Filed
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Case Management Conference) Minute Order |
|
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Case Management Conference) Minute Order |
|
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
On the Complaint filed by Ives on 05/11/2020, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Chris Ives as to the entire action Dismissal |
|
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
The case is removed from the special status of: Legacy - Removed from Court control Case |
|
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
The case is removed from the special status of: Stay - Removal to Federal Court Case |
|
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed and Received by: Chris Ives (Plaintiff) As to: Glaxo Smith Kline, LLC (Defendant); Glaxo Smith Kline, PLC (Defendant); Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, INC (Defendant) et al. Document |
|
July 26, 2022 | Compliance Hearing | ||
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Compliance Hearing; Case Management Conference) Minute Order |
|
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Compliance Hearing scheduled for 07/26/2022 at 10:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 21 Event |
|
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case reassigned to Rene C. Davidson Courthouse in Department 21 - Hon. Evelio Grillo Assignment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.