Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Campbell, Gary, Gary Campbell, filed a(n) Product Liability case against Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pahrmaceuticals, Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim Usa Corporation, Glaxosmithkline, Llc, Glaxosmith, Plc, (total of 10) See All in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Evelio M. Grillo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEvelio M. Grillo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management18 days |
Filing DateMay 11, 2020 |
CategoryProduct Liability |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions21 days |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
||
Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: September 01, 2020Notice of Ruling Filed by: Gary Campbell (Plaintiff)
Date: January 10, 2022Hearing Reset to Complex Determination Hearing 07/10/2020 09:30 AM D- 23
Date: June 10, 2020Case Management Conference 09/01/2020 03:00 PM D- 23
Date: May 29, 2020Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 01/05/2021 03:00 PM D- 23
Date: October 07, 2020Notice of Related Case(s) Filed
Date: June 03, 2020Notice of Removal Filed for Pfizer, Inc
Date: June 17, 2020Summons Issued and Filed
Date: April 27, 2021Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: September 01, 2020Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: May 11, 2020First Amended Complaint Filed
Date: April 27, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Gary cAMPBELL
Date: May 11, 2020Complaint - Product Liability Filed
Date: May 11, 2020Notice of of Submission of the following: Filed
Date: May 05, 2021Hearing Reset to Complex Determination Hearing 07/10/2020 09:30 AM D- 23
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Notice of Removal Filed for Pfizer, Inc
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Related Case(s) Filed
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00Notice of of Submission of the following: Filed
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 01/05/2021 03:00 PM D- 23
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Complaint - Product Liability Filed
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Gary cAMPBELL
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Case Management Conference 09/01/2020 03:00 PM D- 23
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party GlaxoSmith, plc, Boehringer Ingelheim Cor
Date: 2020-06-01T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Case Management Conference) Minute Order |
|
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Case Management Conference) Minute Order |
|
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
On the Amended Complaint filed by Campbell on 05/03/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Gary Campbell as to Sanofi US Services Inc. and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC Dismissal |
|
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed and Received by: Gary Campbell (Plaintiff) As to: GlaxoSmithKline, LLC (Defendant); GlaxoSmith, plc (Defendant); Boehringer Ingelheim Pahrmaceuticals, Inc (Defendant) et al. Document |
|
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
ERROR with ROA message definition 92 on [ln 32, col 39] with Document:35147176 Document |
|
July 26, 2022 | Compliance Hearing | ||
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Compliance Hearing; Case Management Conference) Minute Order |
|
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
The case is removed from the special status of: Provisionally Complex – Party Case |
|
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Compliance Hearing scheduled for 07/26/2022 at 10:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 21 Event |
|
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case reassigned to Rene C. Davidson Courthouse in Department 21 - Hon. Evelio Grillo Assignment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.