Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Geico Indemnity Company, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case against Darensburg , Malcolm, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Ronni B. MacLaren presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management135 days |
|
Filing DateApril 02, 2019 |
CategoryInsurance Coverage |
Time To Trial135 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
|
Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Malcolm Darensburg
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Geico Indemntiy Company
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Notice of Mediation Referral Filed
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Complaint - Insurance Coverage Filed
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Notice of Mediator Selection Filed
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Notice of Mediation Date Received
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2019-08-29T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 08/15/2019 09:00 AM D- 25
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Notice of Mediator Report Received
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: August 24, 2020Proof of Service on Complaint As to Malcolm Darensburg Filed
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: September 04, 2020Case Management Statement of Malcolm Darensburg Filed
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00Declaration of Katie R. Aul in Response to OSC Re: Failure to File Case Management Statement Filed
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.