Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Aaron Villareal, Villareal, Aaron, Villareal, Yanira, Yanira Villareal, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Brandt, Brian, Brian Brandt, against Jonathan Hopkins Muse, Muse, Jonathan Hopkins, Rouge Transportation, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Ronni B. MacLaren presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 04, 2019 |
CategoryAuto Tort |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Declaration Filed
Date: August 29, 2019First Amended Complaint Filed
Date: April 22, 2019Amended Petition to Approve Minors Compromise Filed
Date: June 05, 2019Application Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem As to Aaron Villareal Denied
Date: April 09, 2019Proposed Order Declaration|
Date: May 07, 2019Application Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Filed for Aaron Villareal
Date: April 22, 2019Proposed Order Received
Date: June 05, 2019Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: August 30, 2019Proposed Order
Date: May 09, 2019Petition for Compromise of Minor's Claim Granted
Date: June 12, 2019Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed
Date: May 31, 2019Complaint - Auto Tort Filed
Date: April 04, 2019Declaration Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:
Date: May 07, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Yanira Villareal
Date: April 04, 2019Application Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Filed for Aaron Villareal
Date: April 04, 2019Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: April 24, 2019Petition for Compromise of Minor's Claim Filed
Date: May 09, 2019Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: August 30, 2019Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: June 12, 2019Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: June 12, 2019Application Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Granted
Date: April 24, 2019Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: April 05, 2019Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: April 09, 2019Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: August 30, 2019Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: June 12, 2019Initial Case Management Conference 08/19/2019 09:00 AM D- 25
Date: April 05, 2019Petition for Compromise of Minor's Claim Granted
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Petition for Compromise of Minor's Claim Filed
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Proposed Order Received
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: August 30, 2019Declaration Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 08/19/2019 09:00 AM D- 25
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Amended Petition to Approve Minors Compromise Filed
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Complaint - Auto Tort Filed
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Application Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Filed for Aaron Villareal
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Yanira Villareal
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Application Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem As to Aaron Villareal Denied
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Application Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Granted
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Application Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Filed for Aaron Villareal
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2019-08-29T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.