Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Alderplaza 36 Llc, Hotaki, Abdul, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Hotaki, Abdul, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Ronni B. MacLaren presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management178 days |
|
Filing DateFebruary 19, 2019 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
Time To Trial178 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Alderplaza 26 LLC
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 05/01/2019 09:30 AM D- 511
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 07/10/2019 09:00 AM D- 25
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Jeffery A Chen Filed
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party As to Abdul Hotaki Rejected
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed for Alderplaza 36 LLC, Jeffrey Hoktai Lee
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Abdul Hotaki Filed
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: February 10, 2020Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Alderplaza 36 LLC Filed
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Objection and Opposition to Defendant Abdul Hotaki's Filed
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: August 16, 2019Proof of Service on Complaint As to Abdul Hotaki Filed
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Proof of Service on all un-named tenants/occupants Filed
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed for Abdul Hotaki
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Alderplaza 36 LLC, Jeffrey Hoktai Lee Filed
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered
Date: February 10, 2020Unlawful Detainer Court Trial 05/02/2019 09:30 AM D- 511
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: January 09, 2020Motion to Quash Service of Summons Purs. to 418.10 CCP Denied
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Memo To Set Filed for Plaintiff
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons Purs. to 418.10 CCP Filed for Defendant
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: August 16, 2019Case Management Statement of Abdul Hotaki Filed
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Notice of Access to UD Case Issued
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Abdul Hotaki
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Abdul Hotaki Filed
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: complaint Filed
Date: January 31, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.