Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Gala International, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Ratfield, Tod M., Tod M. Ratfield, against Benito Valley Farm, Llc, Benito Valley Farms, Inc., Chu, Linda, Dong He, He, Dong, (total of 6) See All represented by James Cai, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts Superior with Dennis W. Hayashi presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management138 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2019 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil |
Time To Trial307 days |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Proof of Service on Amended Complaint Filed
Date: April 30, 2019Proposed Order
Date: April 21, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: April 21, 2021Proof of Service on Motion
Date: April 21, 2021Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: May 13, 2021Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: January 24, 2022Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: January 24, 2022Updated -- Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel: Result: Granted Result Date: 09/14/2022
Date: 2022-08-08T00:00:00Updated -- Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel: Result: Granted Result Date: 09/14/2022
Date: 2022-08-04T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel Filed by: Attorney As to: Linda Chu (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-08T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel Filed by: Attorney As to: Benito Valley Farm, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by: Gala International, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: January 05, 2022Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Linda Chu (Defendant)
Date: November 03, 2021Reply Plaintiff's Reply Brief Filed by: Gala International, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing - Other Motion Deeming Admitted Truth Facts \/Monetar...)
Date: November 04, 2021Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Benito Valley Farm, LLC (Defendant)
Date: November 03, 2021Opposition OPPOSITION TO MOTION Filed by: Gala International, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: October 20, 2021Declaration DECLARATION OF LINDA CHU Filed by: Linda Chu (Defendant)
Date: October 20, 2021Proposed Order
Date: October 04, 2021Motion Deeming Admitted Truth Facts \/Monetary Sanctions Filed by Gala International, Inc.
Date: October 04, 2021Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: October 05, 2021Case Management Statement of Gala International, Inc. Filed
Date: September 08, 2021Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: August 16, 2021Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: September 27, 2021Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: September 27, 2021Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: August 16, 2021Substitution of Attorney Filed for Benito Valley Farm, LLC
Date: September 23, 2021Motion Granted
Date: July 29, 2021Proposed Order
Date: June 11, 2021Proof of Service on Motion
Date: June 11, 2021Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: July 29, 2021Notice of Motion
Date: June 11, 2021Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: July 29, 2021Case Management Statement of Gala International, Inc. Filed
Date: July 29, 2021Motion Filed by Gala International, Inc.
Date: June 11, 2021Motion to Continue Trial Date Granted in Part
Date: May 26, 2021Motion to Rescind or Revoke Certificate of Dissolution, Denied
Date: May 13, 2021Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: May 13, 2021Case Management Conf Continuance 08/16/2021 02:30 PM D- 518
Date: May 26, 2021Declaration of Service by Mail - Minutes
Date: April 22, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: May 12, 2021Proposed Order
Date: February 25, 2021Not Found or Non Service Return Filed
Date: May 12, 2021Case Management Conf Continuance 06/15/2021 02:30 PM D- 518
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 05/25/2021 09:00 AM D- 303
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Motion to Amend Complaint Reservation Set for dept: 518 date: 05/13/2021 time: 02:30 PM
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: November 19, 2019Civil Jury Trial 06/28/2021 08:45 AM D- 518
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Returned Mail: Order Filed
Date: May 10, 2021Returned Mail: Case Management Order Filed
Date: December 02, 2019Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party As to Benito Valley Farm, LLC, Dong He Entered
Date: October 09, 2019Notes: (MSC set on 05-25-21 at 8:30AM in Dept. 303 via BlueJeans Video Conference)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Hearing Confirmed for 04/22/2021 02:30 PM D- 5
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial Date Hearing Confirmed for 05/13/2021 02:30 PM D- 518
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: May 10, 2021Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed
Date: April 28, 2021Motion to Rescind or Revoke Certificate of Dissolution, Hearing Confirmed for 05/13/2021 02:30 PM D
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial Date Taken Under Submission
Date: May 13, 2021TR - Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Granted
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: November 19, 2019Case Management Conf Continuance 05/10/2021 02:30 PM D- 518
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial Date Filed for Plaintiff
Date: April 21, 2021Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed for Defendant
Date: February 25, 2021Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: April 22, 2021Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: November 19, 2019Case Management Statement of Gala International, Inc. Filed
Date: November 01, 2019Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Benito Valley Farm, LLC, Dong He Filed
Date: October 08, 2019Case Management Conf Continuance 11/19/2019 02:30 PM D- 518
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: February 25, 2021Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Granted
Date: April 22, 2021Case Management Statement of Gala International, Inc. Filed
Date: April 19, 2021Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 05/19/2021 09:00 AM D- 303
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: May 10, 2021Order Resetting Mandatory Settlement Conference Filed
Date: April 27, 2021Case Management Conf Continuance 06/17/2021 02:30 PM D- 518
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: April 26, 2021Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: April 22, 2021Case Management Statement of Benito Valley Farms, Inc., Linda Chu Filed
Date: July 25, 2019Notice of Further Case Management Conference Filed
Date: July 22, 2019Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: August 09, 2019Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: July 12, 2019Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: June 03, 2019Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: August 09, 2019Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: June 03, 2019Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: July 12, 2019Case Management Statement of Gala International, Inc. Filed
Date: July 26, 2019Case Management Conf Continuance 08/09/2019 02:30 PM D- 518
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Release of Funds Issued and Filed
Date: July 02, 2019Case Management Conf Continuance 07/12/2019 02:30 PM D- 518
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: August 09, 2019Case Management Statement of Gala International, Inc. Filed
Date: July 03, 2019Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: June 03, 2019Case Management Statement of Gala International, Inc. Filed
Date: May 14, 2019Case Management Statement of Benito Valley Farms, Inc., Linda Chu Filed
Date: May 20, 2019Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees Filed
Date: May 20, 2019First Amended Complaint Filed
Date: April 15, 2019Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: January 16, 2019Initial Case Management Conference 06/03/2019 02:30 PM D- 518
Date: February 21, 2019Declaration of Christopher A Lisieski Filed
Date: March 20, 2019Court File Transfer to Hayward Hall of Justice
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: February 21, 2019Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed (Amended)
Date: January 16, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Gala Internation, Inc.
Date: January 16, 2019Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: February 15, 2023Case Management Statement Filed by: Gala International, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-08T00:00:00Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by: Gala International, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-19T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel; Hearing on Motio...)
Date: 2022-09-14T00:00:00Updated -- Notice of Motion Amended: Name Extension: Amended As To Parties: removed
Date: 2022-08-16T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by: Linda Chu (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-16T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 06/03/2019 02:30 PM D- 518
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed (Amended)
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Gala Internation, Inc.
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00Declaration of Christopher A Lisieski Filed
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Gala International, Inc. Filed
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Benito Valley Farms, Inc., Linda Chu Filed
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Linda Chu, Benito Valley Farms, Inc.
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees Filed
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Release of Funds Issued and Filed
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Gala International, Inc. Filed
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Benito Valley Farms, Inc., Linda Chu Filed
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Notice of Further Case Management Conference Filed
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Gala International, Inc. Filed
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party As to Benito Valley Farm, LLC, Dong He Entered
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Benito Valley Farm, LLC, Dong He Filed
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Gala International, Inc. Filed
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed for Defendant
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Returned Mail: Case Management Order Filed
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Motion to Rescind or Revoke Certificate of Dissolution, Filed by Gala International, Inc.
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial Date Filed for Plaintiff
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Gala International, Inc. Filed
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Order Resetting Mandatory Settlement Conference Filed
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Granted
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Returned Mail: Order Filed
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Not Found or Non Service Return Filed
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial Date Granted in Part
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Motion to Rescind or Revoke Certificate of Dissolution, Denied
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Gala International, Inc. Filed
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Motion to Rescind or Revoke Certificate of Dissolution, Taken Under Submission
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Order Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion To Rescind Or Revoke Certificate of Dissolution Filed
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Case Management Conf Continuance 08/16/2021 02:30 PM D- 518
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Motion Filed by Gala International, Inc.
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Gala International, Inc. Filed
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Motion Granted
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial Date Taken Under Submission
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Motion Deeming Admitted Truth Facts \/Monetary Sanctions Filed by Gala International, Inc.
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed for Benito Valley Farm, LLC
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Tentative Case Management Order
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Proof of Service on Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.