Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Lombera, Maria Alma, Maria Alma Lombera, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Frangos, Ilya D., Frye, John N., against Alhambra Dental Group, Alireza Moheb, D.D.S, Moheb, D.D.S, Alireza, Oakland Smile Center, Unlimited Smiles-San Miguel Dental Group, (total of 5) See All represented by Goldman, Ronald P., in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts Superior with Eumi K. Lee presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management142 days |
|
Filing DateJune 06, 2017 |
CategoryCivil Unlimited (Medical Malpractice - Physici...) |
Time To Trial142 days |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: September 15, 2020Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 3 Filed
Date: February 19, 2021Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: February 22, 2021Motion in Limine Regarding the Use of Medical Literature at Trial Filed
Date: February 19, 2021Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: March 01, 2021Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: January 19, 2022Motion in Limine Objecting to Plaintiff's Exhibits Nos 2-14 Filed
Date: February 19, 2021Motion in Limine For Notice of Witnesses to be Called the Next Trial Day Filed
Date: February 19, 2021Motion in Limine Objecting to Plaintiff's Exhibit No. 1 Filed
Date: February 19, 2021Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 1 Filed
Date: February 19, 2021Motion in Limine Objecting to Plaintiff's Exhibit No. 23 Filed
Date: February 19, 2021Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 4 Filed
Date: February 19, 2021Motion in Limine Objecting to Plaintigff's Exhibits Nos 18, 20, 27 Filed
Date: February 19, 2021Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: February 22, 2021Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: February 22, 2021Notice of Case Reassignment Filed by: Clerk
Date: October 27, 2021Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation Filed by: Clerk
Date: December 08, 2021Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: March 01, 2021Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: January 19, 2022Initial Case Management Conference 10/26/2017 02:00 PM D- 20
Date: June 12, 2017Complaint Medical Malpractice Filed
Date: June 06, 2017Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: June 12, 2017Answer to Complaint Filed for Alireza Moheb, D.D.S
Date: July 31, 2017Proof of Service on Complaint As to Oakland Smile Center Filed
Date: July 10, 2017Case Management Statement of Maria Alma Lombera Filed
Date: September 26, 2017Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Maria Alma Lombera
Date: June 06, 2017Proof of Service on Complaint As to Alireza Moheb, D.D.S Filed
Date: July 10, 2017Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: September 26, 2017Proof of Service on Complaint As to Alhambra Dental Group Filed
Date: July 10, 2017Substitution of Attorney Filed for Alireza Moheb, D.D.S
Date: December 18, 2017Case Management Statement of Alireza Moheb, D.D.S Filed
Date: October 03, 2017Case Management Statement of Maria Alma Lombera Filed
Date: October 05, 2017Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees Filed
Date: September 26, 2017Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed
Date: April 17, 2018Case Management Statement of Maria Alma Lombera Filed
Date: April 17, 2018Statement of plaintiff Maria Alma Lombera's MSC Statement Filed
Date: December 04, 2018Status Report (Joint) Filed
Date: May 09, 2018Application Re: Continuance of Trial Date Filed for Alireza Moheb, D.D.S
Date: June 29, 2018Proposed Order Application|
Date: June 29, 2018Application Re: Continuance of Trial Date Granted
Date: July 03, 2018Miscellaneous Readiness Conference Statement Filed
Date: October 25, 2018Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 11/19/2018 03:00 PM D- 20
Date: July 09, 2018Settlement Conference Statement of Maria Alma Lombera Filed
Date: December 05, 2018Settlement Conference Statement of Maria Alma Lombera Filed
Date: November 05, 2018Miscellaneous Dept. 303 Sign in Sheet Filed
Date: December 11, 2018Application Re: Continuance of Trial Date Filed for Maria Alma Lombera
Date: January 03, 2019Judge's Memo to Clerk: Settlement Conference
Date: December 11, 2018Pre-MSC Readiness Conference Statement Filed
Date: January 28, 2020Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: December 11, 2018Declaration in Support Application|
Date: January 03, 2019Proposed Order Application|
Date: January 03, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Application|
Date: January 03, 2019Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Trial Date Filed for Maria Alma Lombera
Date: January 07, 2019Application Re: Continuance of Trial Date Denied
Date: January 04, 2019Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Trial Date Granted
Date: January 07, 2019Settlement Conference Statement of Maria Alma Lombera Filed
Date: January 25, 2021PRE-MSC Statement Filed
Date: January 27, 2020Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Trial Date Filed for Maria Alma Lombera
Date: September 15, 2020Stipulation To Continue Trial Filed
Date: September 15, 2020Settlement Conference Statement of Maria Alma Lombera Filed
Date: March 10, 2020Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Trial Date Granted
Date: September 21, 2020Motion in Limine re: Conduct of Counsel, Clients, Witnesses During Trial Filed
Date: February 19, 2021Motion in Limine limine 2 Filed
Date: February 17, 2021Trial Brief Filed
Date: February 17, 2021Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: February 05, 2021Motion in Limine to Preclude Claims or Evidence Related to Damage Items Filed
Date: February 19, 2021Judge's Memo to Clerk: Settlement Conference
Date: February 05, 2021Dept. 303 sign in sheet Filed
Date: February 05, 2021Jury Instructions Filed
Date: February 17, 2021Motion in Limine to Preclude any Mention of Complaints or Accusations to the Dental Board Filed
Date: February 19, 2021Motion in Limine Lime 3 Filed
Date: February 17, 2021Motion in Limine Limine no 5 Filed
Date: February 17, 2021Motion in Limine Lime 4 Filed
Date: February 17, 2021Motion in Limine No 1 Filed
Date: February 17, 2021Pltf's Witness List Filed
Date: February 17, 2021Exhibit List Filed
Date: February 17, 2021Motion in Limine Regarding "Golden Rule" Arguments Filed
Date: February 19, 2021Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: June 06, 2017Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: February 01, 2018Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: October 26, 2017Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: February 01, 2018Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: May 09, 2018Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: October 26, 2017Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: October 26, 2017Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: May 09, 2018Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: July 03, 2018Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: July 03, 2018Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: November 19, 2018Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: November 19, 2018Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: November 19, 2018Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: September 15, 2020Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: January 07, 2019Motion in Limine to Preclude Law Witnesses from Providing Opinion on Standard of Care Filed
Date: February 19, 2021Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: February 19, 2020Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: January 07, 2019Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: February 19, 2020Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: February 19, 2020Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: March 28, 2020Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: March 28, 2020Motion in Limine to Preclude Plaintiff from Attempting to Elicit Expert Opinion Testimony Filed
Date: February 19, 2021Proof of Service on Complaint As to Alireza Moheb, D.D.S Filed
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2017-06-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Maria Alma Lombera Filed
Date: 2017-09-26T00:00:00Complaint Medical Malpractice Filed
Date: 2017-06-06T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2017-06-12T00:00:00Settlement Conference Statement of Maria Alma Lombera Filed
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Alireza Moheb, D.D.S
Date: 2017-07-31T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Settlement Conference Statement of Maria Alma Lombera Filed
Date: 2018-11-05T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Alhambra Dental Group Filed
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Unlimited Smiles-San Miguel Dental Group Filed
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Oakland Smile Center Filed
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Maria Alma Lombera
Date: 2017-06-06T00:00:00Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees Filed
Date: 2017-09-26T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 10/26/2017 02:00 PM D- 20
Date: 2017-06-12T00:00:00Settlement Conference Statement of Maria Alma Lombera Filed
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Maria Alma Lombera Filed
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed for Alireza Moheb, D.D.S
Date: 2017-12-18T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2017-10-26T00:00:00Application Re: Continuance of Trial Date Granted
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Statement of plaintiff Maria Alma Lombera's MSC Statement Filed
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Trial Date Granted
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Application Re: Continuance of Trial Date Filed for Maria Alma Lombera
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Pre-MSC Readiness Conference Statement Filed
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00PRE-MSC Statement Filed
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: 2017-09-26T00:00:00Judge's Memo to Clerk: Settlement Conference
Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Maria Alma Lombera Filed
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Alireza Moheb, D.D.S Filed
Date: 2017-10-03T00:00:00Status Report (Joint) Filed
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2017-10-26T00:00:00Application Re: Continuance of Trial Date Denied
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 11/19/2018 03:00 PM D- 20
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 09/17/2018 09:00 AM D- 303
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Miscellaneous Readiness Conference Statement Filed
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Application Re: Continuance of Trial Date Filed for Alireza Moheb, D.D.S
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Miscellaneous Dept. 303 Sign in Sheet Filed
Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Trial Date Filed for Maria Alma Lombera
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-03-28T00:00:00Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Dept. 303 sign in sheet Filed
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Motion in Limine limine 2 Filed
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Stipulation To Continue Trial Filed
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Judge's Memo to Clerk: Settlement Conference
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Motion in Limine Lime 3 Filed
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Settlement Conference Statement of Maria Alma Lombera Filed
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Tentative Case Management Order
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Jury Instructions Filed
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Motion in Limine No 1 Filed
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Trial Date Granted
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Trial Date Filed for Maria Alma Lombera
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine Limine no 5 Filed
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Motion in Limine Lime 4 Filed
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Tentative Case Management Order
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | RG17862894: Lombera VS Moheb, D.D.S 01/23/2024 Hearing on Motion for New Trial filed by Alireza Moheb, D.D.S (Defendant) in Department 301 Tentative Ruling - 01/22/2024 James Reilly Parties to appear.... | |
October 23, 2023 | Jury Trial | ||
October 16, 2023 | Pre-Trial Conference | ||
October 03, 2022 | Jury Trial | ||
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial scheduled for 10/03/2022 at 09:00 AM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 512 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 05/08/2023 09:00 AM Event |
|
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Updated -- Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial: Result: Granted Result Date: 09/28/2022 Document |
|
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 05/01/2023 at 09:00 AM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 512 Event |
|
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial Signed and Filed by: Maria Alma Lombera (Plaintiff) As to: Alireza Moheb, D.D.S (Defendant) Document |
|
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 09/26/2022 at 09:30 AM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 512 updated: Result Date to 09/26/2022 Result Type to Held Event |
|
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order re: Pre-Trial Conference Signed and Filed by: Clerk Document |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.