Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Perkins, Delores, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Johnson, Clorissa, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Michael E. Ballachey presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 21, 2016 |
CategoryCh-100 Request For Orders To Stop Harassment (Civil Harassment) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Case Cycle Time26 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2016 |
Petition for Injunction Prohibiting Harassment
Judge: Michael Ballachey |
||
November 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Civil Harassment Commenced and Completed | |
November 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Petition for Injunction Prohibiting Harassment Dismissed | |
November 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Civil Harassment 11/16/2016 01:35 PM D- 514 | |
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Continue Hearing and Reissue Temporary Restraining Order (Civil Harassment) Granted | |
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Civil Harassment 11/16/2016 01:35 PM D- 511 | |
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of New Hearing Date and Order on Reissuance (Civil Harassment) (CLETS) Filed | |
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Continue Hearing and Reissue Temporary Restraining Order (Civil Harassment) Filed by Petitioner | |
October 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Civil Harassment 11/09/2016 01:35 PM D- 511 | |
October 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Petition for Injunction Prohibiting Harassment Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.