Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Prudential Overall Supply, A Corporation, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against R J R Technologies, Inc., A Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Paul D. Herbert presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management245 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 14, 2016 |
CategoryCollections |
Time To Trial245 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions74 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time400 days |
Complaint - Collections Filed
Date: 2016-01-14T00:00:00Request Re: Default and Default Clerk's Judgment (Money) As To R J R Technologies, Inc., a corporati
Date: 2016-03-28T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to R J R Technologies, Inc., a corporation Filed
Date: 2016-03-28T00:00:00Request Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Filed
Date: 2016-05-06T00:00:00Letter re Request for Default Clerk's Judgment Not Entered/ Filed
Date: 2016-04-28T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Set Aside Default As To R J R Technologies, Inc., a corporation
Date: 2016-06-14T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2016-01-14T00:00:00Miscellaneous Order to Consolidate Filed
Date: 2016-02-23T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Set Aside Default Granted
Date: 2016-06-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Prudential Overall Supply, a corporation
Date: 2016-01-14T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: complaint Filed
Date: 2016-11-29T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 09/15/2016 02:00 PM D- 20
Date: 2016-08-01T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: February 14, 2017Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2016-08-01T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: 2016-07-01T00:00:00Order Vacating Default Filed
Date: 2016-07-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Prudential Overall Supply, a corporation Filed
Date: 2016-08-30T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed
Date: February 15, 2017Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2017-01-11T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for R J R Technologies, Inc., a corporation
Date: 2016-07-28T00:00:00Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: February 02, 2017Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2016-09-15T00:00:00Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: February 17, 2017Case Management Statement of R J R Technologies, Inc., a corporation Filed
Date: 2016-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Conditional Settlement (CRC 3.1385) As to Plaintiff Prudential Overall Supply, a corporati
Date: 2016-11-18T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2016-09-15T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: February 17, 2017Compliance Hearing 10/04/2016 09:00 AM D- 14
Date: 2016-07-11T00:00:00Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed
Date: 2016-09-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.