Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Latifi, Lima, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Safeway, Inc., New Albertson'S, Inc., Albertson'S Llc, Ab Acquisition, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Robert B. Freedman presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management199 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2016 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Tort |
Time To Trial199 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time302 days |
Case Management Statement of Lima Latifi Filed
Date: 2016-07-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Safeway, Inc. Filed
Date: July 07, 2016Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2016-05-14T00:00:00Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed
Date: 2016-01-05T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2016-01-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Lima Latifi
Date: 2016-01-05T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2016-01-08T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: July 22, 2016Initial Case Management Conference 05/20/2016 10:00 AM D- 20
Date: 2016-01-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Lima Latifi Filed
Date: 2016-05-12T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: July 22, 2016Answer to Complaint Filed for Safeway, Inc.
Date: 2016-07-06T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: October 25, 2016Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed
Date: November 02, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.