Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Habib VS Mejia
On January 05, 2016 a civil case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. Judge Sandra K. Bean presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 05, 2016
Last Refreshed
February 23, 2021
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Kimberly E. Colwell;Category
Auto Tort
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
5 months and 16 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed |
|
June 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered | |
June 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed |
|
May 19, 2016 |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Sandra K. Bean |
||
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Order Issued |
|
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed |
|
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Management Conf Continuance 12/01/2016 02:30 PM D- 301 | |
May 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement of Farooq Habib Filed |
|
May 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement of Jose Reinaldo Mejia, Haim Zonenchin Filed |
|
April 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Answer to Complaint Filed for Jose Reinaldo Mejia, Haim Zonenchin |
|
March 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 05/19/2016 02:30 PM D- 301 |
|
January 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 05/19/2016 02:30 PM D- 521 |
|
January 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Request Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Kimberly E\. Colwell Granted |
|
January 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued |
|
January 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Request Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Kimberly E\. Colwell Filed for Farooq Habib |
|
January 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Initial Case Management Conference 05/19/2016 09:00 AM D- 18 |
|
January 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued |
|
January 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed |
|
January 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Complaint - Auto Tort Filed |
|
January 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Farooq Habib |
|