Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mudzinski, Raylenne, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Solomon, Gabriel, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Stephen M. Pulido presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management245 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2016 |
CategoryAuto Tort |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time328 days |
Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2016-01-08T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 05/19/2016 03:00 PM D- 509
Date: 2016-01-08T00:00:00Complaint - Auto Tort Filed
Date: 2016-01-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Raylenna Mudzinski
Date: 2016-01-05T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2016-01-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Raylenne Mudzinski Filed
Date: 2016-04-21T00:00:00Application Re: Other Ex Parte Granted
Date: 2016-05-09T00:00:00Declaration of Diligence Filed
Date: June 07, 2016Application Re: Other Ex Parte Granted
Date: 2016-03-09T00:00:00Declaration of Diligence Filed
Date: 2016-02-29T00:00:00Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:
Date: 2016-03-04T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed for Raylenne Mudzinski
Date: November 14, 2016Proof of Service on Complaint As to Gabriel Solomon Filed
Date: 2016-06-07T00:00:00Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:
Date: 2016-05-04T00:00:00Notice of Change of Handling Attorney Filed
Date: 2016-05-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Raylenne Mudzinski Filed
Date: August 10, 2016Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 05/19/2016 03:00 PM D- 16
Date: 2016-03-21T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: November 28, 2016Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: September 06, 2016Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: September 06, 2016Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: 2016-06-07T00:00:00Complaint - Auto Tort Dismissed
Date: November 28, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.