Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Boyett Construction, Inc., filed a(n) General Property - Property case against West Builders, Inc., Veeva Property Holdings, Llc, A California Limited Liability Company, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2016 |
CategoryOther Real Property |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Case Cycle Time76 days |
Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: January 05, 2016Proof of Service by Mail Re: Notice of Case Management Conference and Order Filed
Date: January 25, 2016Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: March 14, 2016Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: complaint Filed
Date: March 21, 2016Initial Case Management Conference 05/19/2016 09:00 AM D- 18
Date: January 06, 2016Notice of Pendency of Action Filed
Date: January 13, 2016Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: January 06, 2016Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Boyett Construction, Inc.
Date: January 05, 2016Answer to Complaint Filed for West Builders, Inc.
Date: February 25, 2016Complaint Other Real Property Filed
Date: 2016-01-05T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.