Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Huynh, Tony Toan, filed a(n) Other Complaint case against Cummings, Shannon, Loos, Jeremy, Lu, Ryan, Ly , Tam, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Thomas Rasch presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2016 |
CategoryOther Complaint |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions122 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time238 days |
Complaint - Other Filed
Date: 2016-01-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Tony Toan Huynh
Date: 2016-01-05T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2016-01-05T00:00:00Notice of Delayed Access to UD Case Issued
Date: 2016-01-06T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed
Date: July 15, 2016Order Filed
Date: 2016-05-24T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed for Tam Ly, Ryan Lu
Date: 2016-05-20T00:00:00Judgment Entered
Date: July 08, 2016Amended Answer to Complaint Filed for Ryan Lu, Tam Ly
Date: 2016-01-28T00:00:00Master Jury Trial 02/26/2016 08:45 AM D- 1
Date: 2016-02-01T00:00:00Memo to Set - Counter Filed for Defendant
Date: 2016-01-25T00:00:00Amended Answer to Complaint Filed for Jeremy Loos, Shannon Cummings
Date: 2016-01-20T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Jeremy Loos Filed
Date: 2016-01-12T00:00:00Master Jury Trial Called and Completed
Date: 2016-02-26T00:00:00Settlement Conference Statement of Tony Toan Huynh Filed
Date: 2016-06-06T00:00:00Proposed Judgment Received
Date: June 21, 2016Proof of Service on Complaint As to Shannon Cummings Filed
Date: 2016-01-12T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Ryan Lu, Tam Ly
Date: 2016-01-13T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Unlawful Detainer Court Trial 02/18/2016 09:00 AM D- 102
Date: 2016-01-27T00:00:00Settlement Conference Statement of Tony Toan Huynh Filed
Date: 2016-02-08T00:00:00Request for Stipulation Filed for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-02-26T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Jeremy Loos, Shannon Cummings
Date: 2016-01-11T00:00:00Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:
Date: 2016-05-18T00:00:00Memo To Set Filed for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-01-20T00:00:00Unlawful Detainer Court Trial 02/11/2016 01:30 PM D- 102
Date: 2016-01-21T00:00:00Memo to Set - Counter Filed for Defendant
Date: 2016-01-28T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party Jeremy Loos, Shannon Cummings Filed
Date: 2016-05-06T00:00:00Application Re: Other Ex Parte Granted
Date: 2016-05-20T00:00:00Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2016-05-24T00:00:00Judgment after Court Trial Filed
Date: July 08, 2016Unlawful Detainer Court Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2016-06-16T00:00:00Unlawful Detainer Court Trial Commenced and Completed
Date: June 17, 2016Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2016-06-15T00:00:00Assignment of Judgment Filed
Date: August 30, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.