Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Fougner, Jon, filed a(n) Writ Of Mandate case against City Of Oakland, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Kimberly E. Colwell presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management76 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryWrit Of Mandate |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
||
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
||
Case Cycle Time321 days |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Jon Fougner
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00Petition for Writ of Mandate Filed
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 03/16/2016 01:30 PM D- 14
Date: 2016-01-06T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: October 03, 2016Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: 2016-02-19T00:00:00Petition for Writ of Mandate - Motion Rescheduled
Date: 2016-05-16T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: November 03, 2016Proof of Service on Complaint As to City of Oakland Filed
Date: 2016-01-12T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2016-01-06T00:00:00Answer to Petition Filed for City of Oakland
Date: 2016-02-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Jon Fougner Filed
Date: 2016-03-02T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2016-03-16T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2016-03-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement of City of Oakland Filed
Date: 2016-03-04T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2016-05-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement of City of Oakland Filed
Date: 2016-05-05T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: 2016-05-02T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2016-05-16T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Commenced and Continued
Date: 2016-05-16T00:00:00Miscellaneous Cover Letter to CIV-100; Request for Dismissal Filed
Date: November 03, 2016Conditional Settlement Entire Action (CRC 3.1385)
Date: 2016-07-05T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Commenced and Completed
Date: November 16, 2016Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered
Date: November 10, 2016Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: complaint Filed
Date: November 04, 2016Petition for Writ of Mandate - Dropped
Date: November 16, 2016Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: complaint Not Entered, Reject Letter Iss'd
Date: November 10, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.