Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cook, Frenisha, Cook-Johnson, Kenzo, Cook, Lita, Cook , Ocean, Johnson, Kenyon, (total of 7) See All filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Andres , Clyde, Greer , Gregory, Grill Properties Llc, Jill Jaffee And Gregory Greer As Trustees Of The Gregory C. Greer And Jill F. Jaffee Revokable Trust, The Gregory C. Greer And Jill F. Jaffee Revokable Trust, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Evelio M. Grillo presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management137 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
Time To Trial307 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions187 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Lita Cook
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00Motion to Amend Complaint Filed by Lita Cook, Kenyon Johnson, Ocean Cook, Kenzo Cook-Johnson, Freni
Date: 2016-03-16T00:00:00Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2016-02-17T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2016-01-05T00:00:00Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed (Amended)
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 05/16/2016 09:15 AM D- 15
Date: 2016-02-29T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 05/16/2016 09:00 AM D- 16
Date: 2016-01-05T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00Application Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Filed for Marlani Russell
Date: 2016-03-21T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2016-02-25T00:00:00Application Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Filed for Kenzo Cook-Johnson
Date: 2016-03-21T00:00:00Application Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Filed for Ocean Cook
Date: 2016-03-21T00:00:00Application Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Filed for Kenyon Johnson
Date: 2016-03-21T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed
Date: 2016-06-22T00:00:00Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem Filed
Date: 2016-03-22T00:00:00Application Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Granted
Date: 2016-03-22T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2016-05-16T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2016-03-22T00:00:00Proof of Service on Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2016-05-09T00:00:00Demurrer 2nd Amended Complaint Filed by Grill Peoperties LLC, The Gregory C. Greer and Jill F. Jaffe
Date: 2016-05-13T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2016-03-23T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2016-05-16T00:00:00Motion to Amend Complaint Granted
Date: 2016-03-23T00:00:00Motion to Strike Portion of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint for Damages Filed by Grill Peopert
Date: 2016-05-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Lita Cook, Kenyon Johnson, Ocean Cook, Kenzo Cook-Johnson, Frenisha Coo
Date: 2016-06-17T00:00:00Reply to Opposition to Demurrer to Second Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2016-06-27T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00Third Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2016-08-17T00:00:00Demurrer - Overruled
Date: 2016-07-05T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2016-07-05T00:00:00Reply to Opposition to Motion to Strike Second Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2016-06-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Grill Properties LLC, The Gregory C. Greer and Jill F. Jaffee Revokable
Date: 2016-07-19T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 10/03/2016 09:15 AM D- 15
Date: 2016-07-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Clyde Andres Filed
Date: 2016-09-29T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Grill Properties LLC, The Gregory C. Greer and Jill F. Jaffee Revokabl
Date: 2016-07-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Lita Cook, Kenyon Johnson, Ocean Cook, Kenzo Cook-Johnson, Frenisha Coo
Date: 2016-09-21T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2016-10-03T00:00:00Motion to Strike Denied
Date: 2016-07-05T00:00:00Answer to Amended Complaint Filed for Clyde Andres
Date: 2016-09-29T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Amend Complaint Filed for Lita Cook, Kenyon Johnson, Ocean Cook, Kenzo Coo
Date: 2016-08-02T00:00:00Answer to Amended Complaint Filed for Grill Properties LLC, The Gregory C. Greer and Jill F. Jaffee
Date: 2016-09-29T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00Joint Case Management Statement Filed
Date: 2016-06-23T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Amend Complaint Granted
Date: 2016-08-02T00:00:00Joint Case Management Statement Filed
Date: 2016-09-16T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Trial Date Granted
Date: 2017-06-07T00:00:00Petition for Compromise of Minor's Claim Filed
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2017-08-03T00:00:00Petition for Compromise of Minor's Claim - Motion Rescheduled
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Order Civil Trial Re-Setting Order Filed
Date: 2016-12-15T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed
Date: 2017-05-16T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed
Date: 2017-08-03T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2016-10-03T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 07/12/2017 09:00 AM D- 31
Date: 2017-02-09T00:00:00Statement Regarding Minors' Compromises Filed
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2016-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed for Lita Cook, Kenyon Johnson, Ocean Cook, Kenzo Cook-Johnson, Frenisha C
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00Returned Mail: Answer to Third Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2016-10-12T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 03/09/2018 09:30 AM D- 301
Date: 2017-09-09T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Trial Date Filed for Grill Properties LLC, The Gregory C. G
Date: 2017-06-06T00:00:00Joint Case Management Statement Filed
Date: 2016-10-13T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2016-11-02T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: 2017-01-25T00:00:00Miscellaneous Certificate Of Service Filed
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2017-06-07T00:00:00Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2017-12-19T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Order to Deposit Money Filed
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Order Compromise of Minor's Claim Filed
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Statement Filed
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Petition for Compromise of Minor's Claim Granted
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Returned Mail: Case Management Order Filed
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Proposed Order Filed
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2018-06-13T00:00:00Case Management Conf Continuance 06/13/2018 09:15 AM D- 15
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party Grill Properties LLC, The Gregory C. Gre
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Returned Mail: Filed
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2018-06-13T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Continued
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Continued
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00Petition Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: to Replace Guardian Ad Litem
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Civil Ex-Parte 01/23/2019 09:30 AM D- 15
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail on PETITION TO REPLACE GUARDIAN AD LITEM Filed
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00Petition Re: Other Ex Parte Granted
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed for Lita Cook
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Continued
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Receipt/Acknowledgement of Deposit Per Court Order Filed
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00Order for Withdrawal of Trust Funds Filed
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Order for Withdrawal of Trust Funds Filed
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Continued
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Petition Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: placed on calendar by order of the court
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00Petition Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Request Re: Other Ex Parte Granted
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2018-07-19T00:00:00Not Found or Non Service Return Filed
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Declaration of Michael C. Cohen Filed
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Address Filed
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Petition Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: to Disburse Money from Blocked Account
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2018-07-19T00:00:00Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Continued
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Miscellaneous Creditor's Claim in the Amount of $79719.4 for Department of Health Care Services File
Date: 2018-10-15T00:00:00Civil Ex-Parte 01/30/2019 09:30 AM D- 15
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed for Lita Cook
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00Request Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Petition Re: Other Ex Parte Granted
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00Petition Re: Other Ex Parte Denied
Date: 2018-12-20T00:00:00Order on Petition to Replace Guardian ad Litem Filed
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Order on Ex parte Motion to Reconsider Previous Order Filed
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Proposed Order Received
Date: December 18, 2019Motion to Withdraw Funds Granted
Date: February 21, 2020Order for Withdrawal of Funds from Blocked Account Filed
Date: July 15, 2020Motion to Withdraw Funds Filed for Plaintiff
Date: December 18, 2019Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: February 21, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.