Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Kimbrough , Judith, filed a(n) Writ Of Mandate case against Alameda Health System, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Wynne S. Carvill presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management75 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryWrit Of Mandate |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
||
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
||
Case Cycle Time445 days |
Case Management Statement of Judith Kimbrough Filed
Date: 2016-11-21T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Judith Kimbrough Filed
Date: 2016-02-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Judith Kimbrough Filed
Date: 2016-05-20T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Alameda Health System Filed
Date: 2016-03-21T00:00:00Notice of Conditional Settlement (CRC 3.1385) As to Respondent Alameda Health System
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2016-03-15T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: March 02, 2017Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: March 20, 2017Conditional Settlement Entire Action (CRC 3.1385)
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Filed for Respondent
Date: 2017-01-31T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: March 07, 2017Hearing Restored: Case Management Conf Continuance 03/20/2017 09:00 AM D- 511
Date: February 28, 2017Compliance Hearing 05/15/2017 09:15 AM D- 511
Date: 2017-02-27T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2016-01-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Judith Kimbrough
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00Petition for Writ of Mandate Filed
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Judith Kimbrough Filed
Date: 2016-09-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Alameda Health System Filed
Date: 2016-11-23T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 03/15/2016 01:30 PM D- 14
Date: 2016-01-04T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Alameda Health System
Date: 2016-09-06T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued
Date: 2016-06-13T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2016-12-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Alameda Health System Filed
Date: 2016-09-06T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2016-03-15T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2016-12-12T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings - Dropped
Date: March 20, 2017Case Management Statement of Alameda Health System Filed
Date: 2017-02-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Judith Kimbrough Filed
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00Letter re MJOP Filed
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued
Date: 2017-02-27T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings - Motion Rescheduled
Date: March 02, 2017Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered
Date: March 14, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.