Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Catanzaro, Loretta, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Housing Authority Of The City Of Oakland, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Robert B. Freedman presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management140 days |
|
Filing DateApril 03, 2015 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Tort |
Time To Trial328 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time409 days |
Notice of Mediator Selection Filed
Date: March 18, 2016Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Loretta Catanzaro
Date: 2015-04-03T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Re: Answer Filed
Date: 2015-06-23T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2015-04-06T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2015-11-20T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: May 16, 2016Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: February 25, 2016Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2015-11-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Housing Authority of the City of Oakland Filed
Date: 2015-07-30T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to City of Oakland Housing Authority Filed
Date: 2015-05-19T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: February 25, 2016Case Management Statement of Loretta Catanzaro Filed
Date: 2015-11-03T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed for Loretta Catanzaro
Date: 2015-10-08T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Housing Authority of the City of Oakland
Date: 2015-06-23T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Tentative Case Management Order Filed
Date: 2015-11-03T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2015-04-03T00:00:00Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed
Date: 2015-04-03T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2015-08-24T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2015-08-21T00:00:00Rejection Letter Issued on Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2015-04-03T00:00:00Conditional Settlement Entire Action (CRC 3.1385)
Date: March 30, 2016Initial Case Management Conference 08/21/2015 11:00 AM D- 20
Date: 2015-04-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Housing Authority of the City of Oakland Filed
Date: 2015-11-05T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2015-08-21T00:00:00Notice of Mediator Report Filed
Date: March 30, 2016Joint Case Management Statement Filed
Date: 2016-02-16T00:00:00Declaration of Charles Wildman Filed
Date: 2015-08-19T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.