Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Casaglio , Michael, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Elgbal , Haxim, Elbgal , Nasser Abdullah, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Evelio M. Grillo presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management138 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryAuto Tort |
Time To Trial138 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time505 days |
Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: May 19, 2016Case Management Statement of Michael Casaglio Filed
Date: 2015-04-21T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2015-01-07T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2015-05-18T00:00:00Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: March 10, 2016Rejection Letter Issued on Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2015-01-02T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2015-01-05T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 05/18/2015 03:00 PM D- 23
Date: 2015-01-05T00:00:00Joint Case Management Statement Filed
Date: 2015-04-21T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Nasser Abdullah Elbgal, haxim Elgbal
Date: 2015-02-23T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2015-05-18T00:00:00Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: March 04, 2016Proof of Service on Complaint As to Nasser Abdullah Elbgal Filed
Date: 2015-02-20T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to haxim Elgbal Filed
Date: 2015-02-20T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Michael Casaglio
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2015-12-16T00:00:00Compliance Hearing 06/08/2016 03:00 PM D- 23
Date: March 23, 2016Settlement Conference Statement of Nasser Abdullah Elbgal, haxim Elgbal Filed
Date: 2016-02-26T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed for Michael Casaglio
Date: March 17, 2016Joint Case Management Statement Filed
Date: 2015-11-25T00:00:00Complaint - Auto Tort Filed
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Michael Casaglio Filed
Date: 2015-11-30T00:00:00Settlement Conference Statement of Michael Casaglio Filed
Date: 2016-02-26T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2015-12-16T00:00:00Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2015-12-18T00:00:00Miscellaneous Sign in Sheet for Settlement Conference Filed
Date: 2016-03-04T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.