Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
City Of Oakland, East Bay Municipal Utility District, Hobbs , Tracy, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Alameda County, California Department Of Transporation, City Of Emeryville, City Of Oakland, East Bay Municipal Utility District, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Sandra K. Bean presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management138 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Tort |
Time To Trial559 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time898 days |
Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2015-06-29T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2015-10-23T00:00:00Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2015-07-14T00:00:00Petition for Relief from Government Code Claims Provisions Filed for Plaintiff
Date: 2015-07-15T00:00:00Opposition to Petition For Relief From Gov't Code 945.4 Filed
Date: 2015-08-20T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2015-08-21T00:00:00Petition for Relief from Government Code Claims Provisions Denied
Date: 2015-08-28T00:00:00Proposed Order Filed
Date: 2015-08-20T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed
Date: 2015-08-04T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Opposition to Relief from Gov't Code 945.4 Filed
Date: 2015-08-20T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed for East Bay Municipal Utility District
Date: 2015-10-23T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed for City of Oakland
Date: 2015-11-25T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2015-12-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement of East Bay Municipal Utility District Filed
Date: 2016-02-01T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed
Date: August 30, 2016Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Tracy Hobbs
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed (Amended)
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to City of Oakland Filed
Date: 2015-07-02T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 05/18/2015 02:30 PM D- 516
Date: 2015-01-05T00:00:00Declaration in Response to OSC Filed
Date: 2015-06-24T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed for City of Oakland
Date: 2015-08-21T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2015-05-18T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2015-01-05T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2015-05-18T00:00:00Declaration of Rischa S. Cole Filed
Date: 2015-08-20T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Petition for Relief From Gov't Code 945.4 File
Date: 2015-08-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (Amended) on Filed
Date: 2015-08-24T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for City of Oakland
Date: 2015-08-21T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2015-06-29T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2015-07-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement of City of Oakland Filed
Date: 2015-11-20T00:00:00Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2015-12-17T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2016-02-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Tracy Hobbs Filed
Date: 2016-06-17T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 07/12/2016 02:30 PM D- 301
Date: 2016-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Mediator Selection Filed
Date: 2016-04-04T00:00:00Proof of Service on Cross-Complaint As to East Bay Municipal Utility District Filed
Date: 2015-09-14T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2016-02-23T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: cross-complaint Filed
Date: August 24, 2016Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2015-12-07T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2015-08-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Tracy Hobbs Filed
Date: 2015-08-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Tracy Hobbs Filed
Date: 2015-11-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement of City of Oakland Filed
Date: 2016-02-09T00:00:00Reply to Oppositions to Petition for Relief from Government Code Claims Filed
Date: 2015-08-24T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2016-07-12T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 02/23/2016 02:30 PM D- 521
Date: 2015-12-23T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: cross-complaint Entered
Date: January 17, 2017Case Management Statement of East Bay Municipal Utility District Filed
Date: 2015-11-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement of East Bay Municipal Utility District Filed
Date: 2016-06-24T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to East Bay Municipal Utility District Filed
Date: 2015-08-27T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed
Date: January 30, 2017Case Management Statement of Tracy Hobbs Filed
Date: 2016-01-27T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed for East Bay Municipal Utility District
Date: 2015-10-23T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2015-09-21T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2015-09-21T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: 2015-09-14T00:00:00Order Pretrial Conference Filed
Date: June 07, 2017Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: cross-complaint Filed
Date: August 19, 2016Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2016-07-12T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: cross-complaint Filed
Date: January 10, 2017Conditional Settlement Entire Action (CRC 3.1385)
Date: August 19, 2016Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: complaint Filed
Date: June 16, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.