Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Progressive West Insurance Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Martin, Pablo P. Lorenzo, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryAuto Tort |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions197 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time580 days |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Progressive West Insurance Company
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2015-04-24T00:00:00Judgment Entered
Date: August 05, 2015Proof of Service on Amended Complaint Filed
Date: May 18, 2015First Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2015-04-24T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 05/15/2015 10:00 AM D- 20
Date: 2015-01-05T00:00:00Complaint - Auto Tort Filed
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2015-05-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Progressive West Insurance Company Filed
Date: August 06, 2015Statement of Damages Filed
Date: 2015-04-24T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2015-01-05T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.