Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Citibank, N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Gardner , Laverne, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Delbert C. Gee presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management136 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2014 |
CategoryCollections |
Time To Trial166 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time188 days |
Initial Case Management Conference 05/11/2015 02:30 PM D- 510
Date: 2015-01-26T00:00:00Complaint - Collections Filed
Date: 2014-12-26T00:00:00Notice of Trial Filed for Citibank,N.A.
Date: June 19, 2015Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: June 10, 2015Declaration pursuant to CCP 395(b) venue of personal, family or household obligations Filed
Date: 2014-12-26T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2015-01-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Citibank,N.A. Filed
Date: June 02, 2015Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2015-05-11T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: June 10, 2015Proof of Service by Mail re Answer to Contract Filed
Date: 2015-01-23T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Laverne Gardner
Date: 2015-01-23T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Citibank,N.A.
Date: 2014-12-26T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2014-12-26T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Laverne Gardner Filed
Date: 2015-01-27T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2015-05-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Citibank,N.A. Filed
Date: 2015-04-03T00:00:00Conditional Settlement Entire Action (CRC 3.1385)
Date: July 02, 2015Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: July 02, 2015For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.