Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Harris VS Scott
On December 26, 2014 a civil case was filed by Harris, Jacqueline, against Scott, Sheneque, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. Judge Stuart L. Hing presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 26, 2014
Last Refreshed
February 24, 2021
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
Category
CH-100 Request for Orders to Stop Harassment (Civil Harassment)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Harassment
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
1 month and 4 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2015 |
Petition for Injunction Prohibiting Harassment
Judge: Stuart Hing |
||
January 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Civil Harassment Commenced and Completed | |
January 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Petition for Injunction Prohibiting Harassment Dismissed | |
January 09, 2015 |
Petition for Injunction Prohibiting Harassment
Judge: Stuart Hing |
||
January 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Civil Harassment 01/30/2015 09:00 AM D- 5 | |
January 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous CH-116 TRO DENIED - HEARING ON ORDER PENDING. Filed | |
January 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Civil Harassment Commenced and Completed | |
December 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Request Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Jacqueline Harris | |
December 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Request Re: Waive Court Fees As to Jacqueline Harris Granted | |
December 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Filed | |
December 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (Civil Harassment) Denied | |
December 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (Civil Harassment Prevention) Received for Jacqueline Harris | |
December 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration RE:Notice and Delivery of Request for Temporary Emergency Order Filed | |
December 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Petition for Injunction Prohibiting Harassment Filed | |
December 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Civil Harassment 01/09/2015 09:00 AM D- 5 | |
December 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous Denied TRO Filed |