Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gerson, Andrew N, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case against Schwartz, Merrill J, Stark, Wells, Rahl, Schwartz & Schieffer, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Robert B. Freedman presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management226 days |
|
Filing DateAugust 19, 2014 |
CategoryProfessional Negligence |
Time To Trial268 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions212 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Case Cycle Time601 days |
Case Management Statement of Merrill J Schwartz, Stark, Wells, Rahl, Schwartz & Schieffer Filed
Date: 2014-12-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Andrew N Gerson Filed
Date: 2015-03-19T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Andrew N Gerson
Date: 2014-08-19T00:00:00Opposition Filed
Date: 2015-03-06T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2014-08-20T00:00:00Reply in Support of Demurrer Filed
Date: 2015-03-12T00:00:00Demurrer Sustained With Leave to Amend
Date: 2014-12-11T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2015-10-15T00:00:00Notice of of jury fee deposit Filed
Date: 2014-12-18T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Merrill J Schwartz Filed
Date: 2014-10-09T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2015-10-15T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 01/02/2015 10:00 AM D- 20
Date: 2014-08-20T00:00:00Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Merrill J Schwartz, Stark, Wells, Rahl, Schwartz & Schieff
Date: 2015-04-06T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint Filed
Date: 2015-01-05T00:00:00Complaint - Professional Negligence Filed
Date: 2014-08-19T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2014-12-11T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Stark, Wells, Rahl, Schwartz & Schieffer Filed
Date: 2014-10-09T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Filed for Merrill J Schwartz, Stark, Wells, Rahl, Schwartz & Schieffer
Date: 2015-12-23T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2015-04-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Merrill J Schwartz, Stark, Wells, Rahl, Schwartz & Schieffer Filed
Date: 2015-12-23T00:00:00Demurrer to the First Amended Complaint - Overruled
Date: 2015-03-19T00:00:00Status Report Filed
Date: 2015-10-09T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2015-04-03T00:00:00Reply in Support of Defendants General Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint Filed
Date: 2014-12-04T00:00:00Opposition to Defendants' General Demurrer to Complaint Filed
Date: 2014-11-26T00:00:00Demurrer to Complaint Filed by Merrill J Schwartz, Stark, Wells, Rahl, Schwartz & Schieffer
Date: 2014-10-31T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2015-04-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Andrew N Gerson Filed
Date: 2014-12-18T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2015-03-19T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2015-05-14T00:00:00Status Report Filed
Date: 2015-05-07T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2014-12-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Merrill J Schwartz, Stark, Wells, Rahl, Schwartz & Schieffer Filed
Date: 2015-03-24T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2015-05-14T00:00:00Demurrer to the First Amended Complaint Filed by Merrill J Schwartz, Stark, Wells, Rahl, Schwartz &
Date: 2015-01-26T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2014-08-19T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Overnight Filed
Date: 2015-12-23T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: March 18, 2016Motion for Summary Judgment - Motion Rescheduled
Date: 2016-03-10T00:00:00Letter dated March 15, 2016 Filed
Date: March 18, 2016Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: March 18, 2016Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply to MSJ Filed
Date: 2016-03-04T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: March 18, 2016Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: 2016-03-10T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: April 08, 2016Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment Filed
Date: 2016-02-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Merrill J Schwartz, Stark, Wells, Rahl, Schwartz & Schieffer Filed
Date: 2016-03-10T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2016-03-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Andrew N Gerson Filed
Date: 2016-02-25T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed for Andrew N Gerson
Date: April 07, 2016Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed
Date: April 11, 2016Motion for Summary Judgment Denied
Date: 2016-03-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.