Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Tung, Albert, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Edwards, Tichelle, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 19, 2014 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions15 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time90 days |
Proof of Service on Complaint As to Tichelle Edwards Filed
Date: 2014-08-26T00:00:00Proof of Service on all un-named tenants/occupants Filed
Date: September 03, 2014Request Re: Default and Default Clerk's UD Judgment (CCP 1169) As To Tichelle Edwards Filed
Date: September 03, 2014Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Tichelle Edwards Filed
Date: 2014-08-26T00:00:00Request Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Filed
Date: November 03, 2014Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Albert Tung
Date: 2014-08-19T00:00:00Writ of Possession - Satisfied Filed
Date: September 23, 2014Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed
Date: 2014-08-19T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2014-08-19T00:00:00Default Judgment: Clerk's UD (CCP 1169) Entered
Date: September 03, 2014Notice of Delayed Access to UD Case Issued
Date: 2014-08-20T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default as to all un-named tenants/occupants Filed and Entered
Date: 2014-09-03T00:00:00Judgment Entered
Date: November 17, 2014For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.